U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:21-cr-00028-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Swindell
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 18, 2025: [Notice of Substitution of Counsel - USA]
December, 2022
  • December 22, 2022: [Order on Motion for Return of Property/PostTrial]
November, 2022
  • November 01, 2022: [Response to Motion]
October, 2022
  • October 28, 2022: [Order]
September, 2022
  • September 06, 2022: [Return of Property/PostTrial]
  • September 01, 2022: [Return of Property/PostTrial]
April, 2022
  • April 05, 2022: [Notice-other]
  • April 05, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
March, 2022
  • March 18, 2022: [Judgment ]
  • March 14, 2022: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
  • March 09, 2022: [Sentencing ]
  • March 02, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report - Final]
February, 2022
  • February 22, 2022: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued ]
  • February 22, 2022: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • February 22, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • February 16, 2022: [Notice of Hearing ]
January, 2022
  • January 27, 2022: [Order Setting/Resetting Hearings]
  • January 25, 2022: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued ]
  • January 25, 2022: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • January 25, 2022: [Notice of Hearing ]
  • January 21, 2022: [Objection to PSI]
  • January 18, 2022: [Objection to PSI]
  • January 03, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report -Draft]
November, 2021
  • November 01, 2021: [Order for Forfeiture of Property]
  • November 01, 2021: [Plea Agreement ]
  • November 01, 2021: [Arraignment ]
  • November 01, 2021: [~Util - Plea Entered]
October, 2021
  • October 14, 2021: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued ]
  • October 14, 2021: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • October 14, 2021: [Notice of Hearing ]
September, 2021
  • September 15, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • September 15, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • September 14, 2021: [Continue ]
  • September 14, 2021: [Extension of Time]
August, 2021
  • August 16, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • August 16, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • August 13, 2021: [Continue ]
  • August 13, 2021: [Extension of Time]
  • August 10, 2021: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued ]
  • August 10, 2021: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • August 09, 2021: [Notice of Hearing ]
July, 2021
  • July 08, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • July 08, 2021: [Motion Submitted]
  • July 07, 2021: [Continue ]
  • July 07, 2021: [Extension of Time]
June, 2021
  • June 16, 2021: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • June 15, 2021: [Detention Hearing ]
  • June 14, 2021: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued ]
  • June 14, 2021: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • June 08, 2021: [Order Setting/Resetting Hearings]
  • June 07, 2021: [Text Order]
  • June 07, 2021: [Pretrial Services Report]
  • June 07, 2021: [Motion Referred]
  • June 06, 2021: [Continue ]
  • June 06, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • June 06, 2021: [Request for Discovery]
  • June 04, 2021: [Scheduling Order ]
  • June 03, 2021: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued ]
  • June 03, 2021: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • June 03, 2021: [Order]
  • June 03, 2021: [Oral Order]
  • June 03, 2021: [Order of Detention - Temporary]
  • June 03, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • June 03, 2021: [Initial Appearance ]
  • June 03, 2021: [Detention]
  • June 03, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • June 03, 2021: [Arrest ]
May, 2021
  • May 26, 2021: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued ]
  • May 26, 2021: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • May 26, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
April, 2021
  • April 08, 2021: [Warrant Requested]
  • April 08, 2021: [Warrant Issued ]
  • April 08, 2021: [Penalty Sheet]
  • April 08, 2021: [Indictment ]
  • April 08, 2021: [Unredacted Document]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.