U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:21-cr-00027-1
  • Case Name: USA v. McNair
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2024
  • October 11, 2024: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney as to 23-SO-6]
  • October 10, 2024: [Withdraw as Attorney Regarding 23-SO-6]
  • October 10, 2024: [Notice of Attorney Appearance Pursuant to 23-SO-6]
November, 2022
  • November 10, 2022: [Document]
September, 2022
  • September 27, 2022: [Notice-other]
  • September 27, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
July, 2022
  • July 21, 2022: [Judgment ]
  • July 21, 2022: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property ]
  • July 21, 2022: [Sentencing ]
  • July 14, 2022: [Forfeiture of Property ]
  • July 14, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • July 13, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report - Final]
  • July 12, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum (NOT SEALED)]
June, 2022
  • June 30, 2022: [Objection to PSI]
  • June 02, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report -Draft]
April, 2022
  • April 13, 2022: [Plea Agreement ]
  • April 13, 2022: [Change of Plea Hearing ]
  • April 13, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • April 05, 2022: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration ]
  • April 05, 2022: [Reconsideration ]
  • April 01, 2022: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • April 01, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • April 01, 2022: [Continue ]
February, 2022
  • February 25, 2022: [Arraignment ]
  • February 25, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • February 11, 2022: [Notice of Hearing ]
  • February 11, 2022: [Order on Motion to Suppress ]
January, 2022
  • January 10, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • January 09, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • January 09, 2022: [Response in Opposition]
December, 2021
  • December 13, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • December 10, 2021: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
November, 2021
  • November 08, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • November 01, 2021: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
October, 2021
  • October 20, 2021: [Suppress ]
August, 2021
  • August 25, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • August 23, 2021: [Extension of Time]
June, 2021
  • June 18, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • June 17, 2021: [Extension of Time]
May, 2021
  • May 26, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • May 25, 2021: [Motion Submitted]
  • May 25, 2021: [Extension of Time]
April, 2021
  • April 28, 2021: [Scheduling Order ]
  • April 28, 2021: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • April 27, 2021: [Detention Hearing ]
  • April 27, 2021: [Detention]
  • April 27, 2021: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • April 26, 2021: [Pretrial Services Report]
  • April 26, 2021: [Request for Discovery]
  • April 26, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • April 22, 2021: [Order]
  • April 22, 2021: [Oral Order]
  • April 22, 2021: [Order of Detention - Temporary]
  • April 22, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • April 22, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • April 22, 2021: [Initial Appearance ]
  • April 22, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • April 22, 2021: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • April 22, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 22, 2021: [Arrest ]
  • April 08, 2021: [Warrant Issued ]
  • April 08, 2021: [Penalty Sheet]
  • April 08, 2021: [Indictment ]
  • April 08, 2021: [Unredacted Document]
  • April 08, 2021: [Warrant Requested]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.