U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:21-cr-00026-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Burrell
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 18, 2023: [USCA Order]
  • January 18, 2023: [USCA Case Number ]
  • January 18, 2023: [Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to USCA]
  • January 18, 2023: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
  • January 17, 2023: [Judgment ]
  • January 03, 2023: [Plea Agreement Accepted ]
  • January 03, 2023: [Exhibit List ]
  • January 03, 2023: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • January 03, 2023: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • January 03, 2023: [Sentencing ]
  • January 02, 2023: [Statement Regarding Substantial Assistance]
December, 2022
  • December 28, 2022: [Seal Document]
  • December 28, 2022: [PROPOSED SEALED Document]
  • December 28, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Document ]
  • December 27, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report - Final]
  • December 26, 2022: [Leave to File Document ]
November, 2022
  • November 21, 2022: [Objection to PSI]
  • November 07, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report -Draft]
August, 2022
  • August 11, 2022: [Order Setting/Resetting Hearings]
  • August 11, 2022: [Plea Agreement ]
  • August 11, 2022: [Consent to Magistrate Arraignment]
  • August 11, 2022: [Arraignment ]
  • August 11, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • August 03, 2022: [Release Status Report]
May, 2022
  • May 31, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • May 31, 2022: [Continue ]
April, 2022
  • April 08, 2022: [SEALED Order]
  • April 08, 2022: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • April 07, 2022: [PROPOSED SEALED Motion]
  • April 07, 2022: [Notice of Deficiency]
  • April 07, 2022: [Seal Document]
  • April 07, 2022: [PROPOSED SEALED Document]
  • April 07, 2022: [Release Status Report]
March, 2022
  • March 18, 2022: [Notice of Substitution of Counsel - USA]
  • March 14, 2022: [Docket Call]
  • March 08, 2022: [Release Status Report]
December, 2021
  • December 22, 2021: [SEALED Order]
  • December 22, 2021: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • December 22, 2021: [Seal Document]
  • December 22, 2021: [PROPOSED SEALED Motion]
  • December 13, 2021: [Notice of Hearing ]
October, 2021
  • October 27, 2021: [SEALED Order]
  • October 27, 2021: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • October 27, 2021: [Notice to Counsel]
  • October 27, 2021: [Seal Document]
  • October 27, 2021: [PROPOSED SEALED Motion]
September, 2021
  • September 20, 2021: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • September 17, 2021: [Modify Conditions of Release]
  • September 01, 2021: [SEALED Order]
  • September 01, 2021: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • September 01, 2021: [Seal Document]
  • September 01, 2021: [PROPOSED SEALED Motion]
  • September 01, 2021: [Release Status Report]
August, 2021
  • August 03, 2021: [Notice of Substitution of Counsel - USA]
  • August 02, 2021: [Notice Regarding US Passport]
July, 2021
  • July 27, 2021: [Order on Motion for Release from Custody ]
  • July 23, 2021: [Unredacted Document]
  • July 23, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release ]
  • July 23, 2021: [Detention Hearing ]
  • July 23, 2021: [Motion Hearing ]
  • July 20, 2021: [Set/Reset Motion and M&R Hearings]
  • July 20, 2021: [Order]
  • July 16, 2021: [Motion Referred]
  • July 16, 2021: [Motion Submitted]
  • July 01, 2021: [Release from Custody ]
June, 2021
  • June 23, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • June 23, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • June 23, 2021: [Extension of Time]
  • June 23, 2021: [Continue ]
May, 2021
  • May 27, 2021: [Text Order]
  • May 27, 2021: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • May 27, 2021: [Detention Hearing ]
  • May 27, 2021: [Waiver of Detention Hearing]
  • May 24, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • May 24, 2021: [Continue ]
  • May 24, 2021: [Docket Call]
  • May 24, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • May 21, 2021: [Pretrial Services Report]
  • May 21, 2021: [Request for Discovery]
  • May 21, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • May 19, 2021: [Scheduling Order ]
  • May 19, 2021: [Order of Detention - Temporary]
  • May 19, 2021: [Initial Appearance ]
  • May 19, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • May 19, 2021: [Order]
  • May 19, 2021: [Oral Order]
  • May 19, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • May 19, 2021: [Detention]
  • May 19, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • May 19, 2021: [Arrest ]
  • May 18, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • May 17, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
April, 2021
  • April 08, 2021: [Warrant Issued ]
  • April 08, 2021: [Penalty Sheet]
  • April 08, 2021: [Indictment ]
  • April 08, 2021: [Unredacted Document]
  • April 08, 2021: [Warrant Requested]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.