U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:21-cr-00038-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Lassiter
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
June, 2022
  • June 22, 2022: [Notice-other]
  • June 22, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
April, 2022
  • April 01, 2022: [Request]
February, 2022
  • February 24, 2022: [Judgment ]
  • February 23, 2022: [SEALED Document]
  • February 23, 2022: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property ]
  • February 23, 2022: [Sentencing ]
  • February 23, 2022: [Forfeiture of Property ]
January, 2022
  • January 18, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report - Final]
November, 2021
  • November 23, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Sentencing]
  • November 23, 2021: [Continue Sentencing]
  • November 19, 2021: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • November 09, 2021: [Objection to PSI]
October, 2021
  • October 26, 2021: [Presentence Investigation Report -Draft]
August, 2021
  • August 10, 2021: [Order Setting/Resetting Hearings]
  • August 10, 2021: [Consent to Magistrate Arraignment]
  • August 10, 2021: [Arraignment ]
June, 2021
  • June 16, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • June 15, 2021: [Continue ]
May, 2021
  • May 19, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
April, 2021
  • April 14, 2021: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • April 14, 2021: [Detention Hearing ]
  • April 14, 2021: [Waiver of Detention Hearing]
  • April 14, 2021: [Pretrial Services Report]
  • April 12, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • April 12, 2021: [Request for Discovery]
  • April 12, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • April 09, 2021: [Scheduling Order ]
  • April 09, 2021: [Text Order]
  • April 09, 2021: [Order of Detention - Temporary]
  • April 09, 2021: [Initial Appearance ]
  • April 09, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 09, 2021: [Detention]
  • April 09, 2021: [Order on Motion to Unseal Case ]
  • April 09, 2021: [Unseal Case]
  • April 09, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • April 09, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • April 09, 2021: [Arrest ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.