U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:21-cr-00159-1
  • Case Name: USA v. KING
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 28, 2025: [Reduce Sentence ]
  • April 02, 2025: [Letter]
January, 2023
  • January 17, 2023: [Notice of Hearing ]
  • January 04, 2023: [Forfeiture of Property ]
  • January 04, 2023: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • January 03, 2023: [Notice of Hearing ]
December, 2022
  • December 29, 2022: [Departure - Sentencing Guidelines]
  • December 16, 2022: [Objection to PSI]
  • December 14, 2022: [Objection to PSI]
  • December 05, 2022: [Notice of Substitution of Counsel - USA]
November, 2022
  • November 29, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report -Draft]
September, 2022
  • September 29, 2022: [Consent to Magistrate Arraignment]
  • September 29, 2022: [Arraignment ]
  • September 29, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • September 29, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • September 20, 2022: [Notice of Hearing ]
July, 2022
  • July 19, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • July 18, 2022: [Continue ]
  • July 07, 2022: [Notice of Hearing ]
May, 2022
  • May 11, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • May 06, 2022: [Continue ]
  • May 03, 2022: [Notice of Hearing ]
March, 2022
  • March 16, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • March 15, 2022: [Continue ]
  • March 03, 2022: [Notice of Hearing ]
January, 2022
  • January 13, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • January 12, 2022: [Continue ]
December, 2021
  • December 22, 2021: [Notice of Hearing ]
November, 2021
  • November 10, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • November 10, 2021: [Continue ]
October, 2021
  • October 25, 2021: [Notice of Hearing ]
  • October 12, 2021: [Continue ]
  • October 04, 2021: [Notice of Hearing ]
August, 2021
  • August 26, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • August 25, 2021: [Motion Submitted]
  • August 25, 2021: [Continue ]
  • August 19, 2021: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • August 18, 2021: [Notice of Substitution of Counsel - USA]
  • August 10, 2021: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued ]
  • August 10, 2021: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • August 03, 2021: [Notice of Hearing ]
June, 2021
  • June 03, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • June 03, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • June 03, 2021: [Motion Referred]
  • June 02, 2021: [Continue ]
May, 2021
  • May 11, 2021: [Notice of Hearing ]
April, 2021
  • April 19, 2021: [Scheduling Order ]
  • April 09, 2021: [Indictment ]
  • April 09, 2021: [Unredacted Document]
  • April 09, 2021: [Penalty Sheet]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.