U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:21-cr-00157-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Yarborough
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 14, 2025: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney as to 23-SO-6]
  • April 11, 2025: [Notice of Attorney Appearance Pursuant to 23-SO-6]
  • April 11, 2025: [Withdraw as Attorney Regarding 23-SO-6]
May, 2022
  • May 31, 2022: [Judgment ]
  • May 27, 2022: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property ]
  • May 27, 2022: [Sentencing ]
  • May 24, 2022: [Forfeiture of Property ]
  • May 24, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • May 18, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report - Final]
  • May 05, 2022: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued ]
  • May 05, 2022: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
April, 2022
  • April 25, 2022: [Objection to PSI]
  • April 13, 2022: [Objection to PSI]
  • April 11, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report -Draft]
February, 2022
  • February 25, 2022: [Plea Agreement ]
  • February 25, 2022: [Arraignment ]
  • February 25, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • February 10, 2022: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued ]
  • February 10, 2022: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • February 02, 2022: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued ]
  • February 02, 2022: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
December, 2021
  • December 13, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • December 07, 2021: [Plea Agreement ]
  • December 07, 2021: [Continue ]
November, 2021
  • November 10, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • November 09, 2021: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued ]
  • November 09, 2021: [Continue ]
  • November 09, 2021: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
October, 2021
  • October 19, 2021: [Notice of Hearing ]
September, 2021
  • September 08, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • September 08, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • September 08, 2021: [Notice of Substitution of Counsel - USA]
  • September 07, 2021: [Extension of Time]
  • September 07, 2021: [Continue ]
July, 2021
  • July 23, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • July 23, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • July 23, 2021: [Motion Submitted]
  • July 21, 2021: [Extension of Time]
  • July 21, 2021: [Continue ]
  • July 09, 2021: [Pretrial Services Report]
  • July 08, 2021: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • July 08, 2021: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • July 08, 2021: [Waiver of Detention Hearing]
  • July 06, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • July 06, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • July 06, 2021: [Motion Referred]
  • July 02, 2021: [Continue ]
  • July 02, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • July 02, 2021: [Request for Discovery]
  • July 02, 2021: [Scheduling Order ]
  • July 01, 2021: [Order of Detention - Temporary]
  • July 01, 2021: [Initial Appearance ]
  • July 01, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • July 01, 2021: [Order]
  • July 01, 2021: [Detention]
  • July 01, 2021: [Oral Order]
  • July 01, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • July 01, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • July 01, 2021: [Arrest ]
June, 2021
  • June 30, 2021: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued ]
  • June 30, 2021: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • June 30, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
April, 2021
  • April 09, 2021: [Warrant Issued ]
  • April 09, 2021: [Penalty Sheet]
  • April 09, 2021: [Indictment ]
  • April 09, 2021: [Unredacted Document]
  • April 09, 2021: [Warrant Requested]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.