U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:21-cr-00156-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Anderson
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2022
  • May 13, 2022: [Rule 20 - Transfer Out]
  • May 12, 2022: [Remark]
  • May 12, 2022: [Notice-other]
April, 2022
  • April 14, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • April 14, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • April 14, 2022: [Extension of Time]
  • April 14, 2022: [Continue ]
March, 2022
  • March 16, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • March 16, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • March 15, 2022: [Extension of Time]
  • March 15, 2022: [Continue ]
February, 2022
  • February 14, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • February 14, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • February 14, 2022: [Extension of Time]
  • February 14, 2022: [Continue ]
January, 2022
  • January 20, 2022: [Request for Discovery]
  • January 20, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • January 19, 2022: [Scheduling Order ]
  • January 19, 2022: [Unredacted Document]
  • January 19, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release ]
  • January 19, 2022: [Initial Appearance ]
  • January 19, 2022: [Order]
  • January 19, 2022: [Oral Order]
  • January 19, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • January 19, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • January 14, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • January 13, 2022: [Rule 5(c)(3) Documents Received ]
  • January 13, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • January 13, 2022: [Arrest - Other District ]
  • January 13, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
August, 2021
  • August 02, 2021: [Notice of Substitution of Counsel - USA]
April, 2021
  • April 09, 2021: [Penalty Sheet]
  • April 09, 2021: [Unredacted Document]
  • April 09, 2021: [Warrant Requested]
  • April 09, 2021: [Warrant Issued ]
  • April 09, 2021: [Indictment ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.