U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:21-cr-00154-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Smith
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
September, 2022
  • September 23, 2022: [Notice of Filing of Official Transcript]
  • September 23, 2022: [Transcript]
March, 2022
  • March 15, 2022: [Letter]
December, 2021
  • December 06, 2021: [Judgment ]
  • December 01, 2021: [Sentencing ]
  • December 01, 2021: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property ]
November, 2021
  • November 23, 2021: [Forfeiture of Property ]
  • November 23, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • November 12, 2021: [Notice of Hearing ]
  • November 10, 2021: [Presentence Investigation Report - Final]
  • November 03, 2021: [Objection to PSI]
  • November 02, 2021: [Objection to PSI]
October, 2021
  • October 20, 2021: [Presentence Investigation Report -Draft]
August, 2021
  • August 31, 2021: [Arraignment ]
  • August 31, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • August 31, 2021: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • August 03, 2021: [Notice of Hearing ]
July, 2021
  • July 16, 2021: [Notice of Substitution of Counsel - USA]
June, 2021
  • June 17, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • June 15, 2021: [Motion Referred]
  • June 15, 2021: [Continue ]
May, 2021
  • May 24, 2021: [Notice of Hearing ]
  • May 06, 2021: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • May 06, 2021: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • May 06, 2021: [Waiver of Detention Hearing]
  • May 04, 2021: [Docket Call]
  • May 04, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • May 04, 2021: [Continue ]
April, 2021
  • April 28, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • April 28, 2021: [Docket Call]
  • April 28, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 28, 2021: [Continue ]
  • April 27, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • April 27, 2021: [Pretrial Services Report]
  • April 27, 2021: [Request for Discovery]
  • April 27, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • April 26, 2021: [Scheduling Order ]
  • April 23, 2021: [Order of Detention - Temporary]
  • April 23, 2021: [Initial Appearance ]
  • April 23, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 23, 2021: [Oral Order]
  • April 23, 2021: [Text Order]
  • April 23, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • April 23, 2021: [Detention]
  • April 23, 2021: [Arrest ]
  • April 23, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • April 16, 2021: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued ]
  • April 16, 2021: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • April 16, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 09, 2021: [Warrant Issued ]
  • April 09, 2021: [Penalty Sheet]
  • April 09, 2021: [Indictment ]
  • April 09, 2021: [Unredacted Document]
  • April 09, 2021: [Warrant Requested]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.