U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cr-00135-1
  • Case Name: USA v. TERRY
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 28, 2022: [Appeal Transcript]
November, 2022
  • November 03, 2022: [Order]
  • November 03, 2022: [USCA Notice of Docketing Record on Appeal]
  • November 02, 2022: [Transmission of Update Item to USCA]
October, 2022
  • October 18, 2022: [Extension of Reporting Date to Prison]
  • October 11, 2022: [Judgment on Revocation of Prob/SR]
  • October 11, 2022: [Extension of Reporting Date to Prison]
September, 2022
  • September 29, 2022: [Extension of Reporting Date to Prison]
  • September 29, 2022: [Motion Submitted]
  • September 28, 2022: [Extension of Reporting Date to Prison]
  • September 06, 2022: [Electronic Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to USCA]
  • September 02, 2022: [Notice of Appeal Without Fee Payment]
August, 2022
  • August 26, 2022: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing - Sentencing]
July, 2022
  • July 11, 2022: [Summons Returned Executed ]
  • July 01, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • July 01, 2022: [Order Appointing Panel Attorney]
June, 2022
  • June 29, 2022: [SEALED Order for Summons]
  • June 28, 2022: [CJA 23 - Financial Affidavit-SEALED]
  • June 24, 2022: [Case Referred to Judge]
  • June 23, 2022: [SEALED USPO PROB 12C - Offender Under Supervision]
  • June 23, 2022: [SEALED USPO PROB 12C - Supplement Report]
August, 2021
  • August 16, 2021: [Judgment on Revocation of Prob/SR]
June, 2021
  • June 30, 2021: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing - Sentencing]
  • June 29, 2021: [SEALED Document]
  • June 28, 2021: [SEALED USPO Memorandum]
  • June 17, 2021: [Notice of Rescheduling]
May, 2021
  • May 27, 2021: [Notice of Rescheduling]
  • May 24, 2021: [Summons Returned Executed ]
  • May 18, 2021: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • May 18, 2021: [Summons Issued]
  • May 17, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • May 14, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • May 13, 2021: [SEALED Order for Summons]
  • May 11, 2021: [Case Reassigned]
  • May 03, 2021: [CJA 23 - Financial Affidavit-SEALED]
April, 2021
  • April 30, 2021: [SEALED USPO PROB 12C - Supplement Report]
  • April 30, 2021: [SEALED USPO PROB 12C - Offender Under Supervision]
  • April 09, 2021: [Transfer In/Supervised Release/Probation Transfer]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.