U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:21-cr-00164-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Clark
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 11, 2023: [Forfeiture of Property ]
  • January 11, 2023: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
October, 2022
  • October 06, 2022: [SEALED Order]
  • October 06, 2022: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • October 05, 2022: [Seal Document]
  • October 05, 2022: [PROPOSED SEALED Motion]
  • October 04, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report - Final]
September, 2022
  • September 24, 2022: [Objection to PSI]
  • September 06, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report -Draft]
June, 2022
  • June 16, 2022: [Order Setting/Resetting Hearings]
  • June 16, 2022: [Consent to Magistrate Arraignment]
  • June 16, 2022: [Plea Agreement ]
  • June 16, 2022: [Dismiss ]
  • June 16, 2022: [Arraignment ]
  • June 16, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
April, 2022
  • April 12, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • April 12, 2022: [Notice of Deficiency]
  • April 12, 2022: [Continue ]
February, 2022
  • February 09, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • February 09, 2022: [Continue ]
January, 2022
  • January 10, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • January 10, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • January 09, 2022: [Extension of Time]
  • January 09, 2022: [Continue ]
November, 2021
  • November 30, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • November 30, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • November 23, 2021: [Extension of Time]
  • November 23, 2021: [Continue ]
  • November 18, 2021: [Notice of Hearing ]
October, 2021
  • October 20, 2021: [Request for Discovery]
  • October 20, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • October 19, 2021: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney ]
  • October 19, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • October 19, 2021: [Continue ]
  • October 19, 2021: [Withdraw as Attorney ]
September, 2021
  • September 07, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • September 07, 2021: [Continue ]
August, 2021
  • August 23, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • August 23, 2021: [Continue ]
June, 2021
  • June 15, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • June 15, 2021: [Continue ]
April, 2021
  • April 28, 2021: [Text Order]
  • April 28, 2021: [Waiver of Detention Hearing]
  • April 28, 2021: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • April 28, 2021: [Detention Hearing ]
  • April 28, 2021: [Pretrial Services Report]
  • April 23, 2021: [Request for Discovery]
  • April 23, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • April 22, 2021: [Scheduling Order ]
  • April 22, 2021: [Order of Detention - Temporary]
  • April 22, 2021: [Initial Appearance ]
  • April 22, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 22, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • April 22, 2021: [Detention]
  • April 22, 2021: [Order]
  • April 22, 2021: [Oral Order]
  • April 22, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • April 22, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • April 22, 2021: [Arrest ]
  • April 21, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 12, 2021: [Warrant Requested]
  • April 12, 2021: [Warrant Issued ]
  • April 12, 2021: [Penalty Sheet]
  • April 12, 2021: [Indictment ]
  • April 12, 2021: [Unredacted Document]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.