U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:21-cr-00163-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Szczerbiak
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2022
  • October 07, 2022: [Amended Judgment]
  • October 06, 2022: [Order on Motion to Alter Judgment ]
  • October 06, 2022: [Alter Judgment ]
July, 2022
  • July 06, 2022: [Judgment ]
June, 2022
  • June 29, 2022: [Sentencing ]
  • June 23, 2022: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • June 22, 2022: [Seal Document]
  • June 22, 2022: [PROPOSED SEALED Document]
  • June 22, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report - Final]
  • June 22, 2022: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property ]
  • June 15, 2022: [Forfeiture of Property ]
  • June 15, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • June 06, 2022: [Objection to PSI]
May, 2022
  • May 24, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report -Draft]
March, 2022
  • March 17, 2022: [Plea Agreement ]
  • March 17, 2022: [Order on Motion to Suppress ]
  • March 17, 2022: [Arraignment ]
  • March 17, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • March 17, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 08, 2022: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • March 02, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • March 01, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • March 01, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
February, 2022
  • February 28, 2022: [Text Order]
  • February 28, 2022: [Continue ]
  • February 28, 2022: [Notice of Hearing on Motion ]
  • February 22, 2022: [Reply to Response ]
  • February 15, 2022: [Notice of Hearing ]
  • February 14, 2022: [Response in Opposition]
January, 2022
  • January 31, 2022: [Suppress ]
December, 2021
  • December 28, 2021: [Extension of Time]
  • December 28, 2021: [Continue ]
  • December 01, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • December 01, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
November, 2021
  • November 30, 2021: [Extension of Time]
  • November 30, 2021: [Continue ]
  • November 04, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • November 04, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
October, 2021
  • October 29, 2021: [Extension of Time]
  • October 29, 2021: [Continue ]
September, 2021
  • September 13, 2021: [Motion Submitted]
  • September 11, 2021: [Extension of Time]
  • September 11, 2021: [Continue ]
July, 2021
  • July 16, 2021: [Extension of Time]
  • July 16, 2021: [Continue ]
June, 2021
  • June 07, 2021: [Order on Sealed Motion for revocation of pretrial release ]
  • June 07, 2021: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
May, 2021
  • May 19, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • May 19, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • May 19, 2021: [Extension of Time]
  • May 19, 2021: [Continue ]
  • May 05, 2021: [Arrest - Other District ]
  • May 05, 2021: [SEALED Document]
  • May 05, 2021: [Rule 5(c)(3) Documents Received ]
  • May 05, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • May 03, 2021: [SEALED Motion for revocation of pretrial release ]
April, 2021
  • April 27, 2021: [Scheduling Order ]
  • April 26, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release ]
  • April 26, 2021: [Detention Hearing ]
  • April 26, 2021: [Pretrial Services Report]
  • April 22, 2021: [Amended Penalty Sheet]
  • April 22, 2021: [Request for Discovery]
  • April 22, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • April 21, 2021: [Order of Detention - Temporary]
  • April 21, 2021: [Initial Appearance ]
  • April 21, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 21, 2021: [Oral Order]
  • April 21, 2021: [Order]
  • April 21, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • April 21, 2021: [Detention]
  • April 21, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • April 21, 2021: [Arrest ]
  • April 20, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 12, 2021: [Warrant Issued ]
  • April 12, 2021: [Penalty Sheet]
  • April 12, 2021: [Indictment ]
  • April 12, 2021: [Unredacted Document]
  • April 12, 2021: [Warrant Requested]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.