U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:21-cr-00162-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Massenburg et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 22, 2025: [Judgment on 2255]
  • May 22, 2025: [Judgment on Motion to Vacate (2255) ]
  • May 22, 2025: [Order on Motion to Dismiss ]
June, 2022
  • June 03, 2022: [Letter]
April, 2022
  • April 05, 2022: [Judgment ]
  • April 05, 2022: [Sentencing ]
March, 2022
  • March 30, 2022: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • March 25, 2022: [Seal Document]
  • March 25, 2022: [PROPOSED SEALED Document]
  • March 15, 2022: [Letter]
February, 2022
  • February 23, 2022: [Order on PROPOSED SEALED Motion]
  • February 23, 2022: [Order on Motion to Seal ]
  • February 23, 2022: [Proposed Order]
  • February 23, 2022: [Notice of Deficiency - Failure to File Proposed Order]
  • February 23, 2022: [Seal ]
  • February 23, 2022: [PROPOSED SEALED Motion]
  • February 07, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report - Final]
  • February 01, 2022: [Objection to PSI]
January, 2022
  • January 11, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report -Draft]
November, 2021
  • November 17, 2021: [Arraignment ]
  • November 17, 2021: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • November 01, 2021: [Judgment ]
October, 2021
  • October 28, 2021: [Sentencing ]
  • October 21, 2021: [Motion Hearing ]
  • October 08, 2021: [Presentence Investigation Report - Final]
September, 2021
  • September 14, 2021: [Objection to PSI]
August, 2021
  • August 27, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • August 27, 2021: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • August 26, 2021: [Extension of Time]
  • August 26, 2021: [Continue ]
  • August 26, 2021: [Presentence Investigation Report -Draft]
July, 2021
  • July 28, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • July 27, 2021: [Continue ]
  • July 27, 2021: [Notice of Deficiency]
  • July 26, 2021: [Continue ]
  • July 26, 2021: [Notice of Hearing ]
  • July 01, 2021: [Plea Agreement ]
  • July 01, 2021: [Arraignment ]
  • July 01, 2021: [~Util - Plea Entered]
June, 2021
  • June 23, 2021: [Release Status Report]
  • June 08, 2021: [Notice of Hearing ]
May, 2021
  • May 27, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • May 26, 2021: [Motion Submitted]
  • May 26, 2021: [Extension of Time]
April, 2021
  • April 30, 2021: [Notice Regarding US Passport]
  • April 30, 2021: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • April 30, 2021: [Text Order]
  • April 30, 2021: [Waiver of Detention Hearing]
  • April 28, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release ]
  • April 28, 2021: [Unredacted Document]
  • April 28, 2021: [Detention Hearing ]
  • April 27, 2021: [Scheduling Order ]
  • April 26, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • April 26, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • April 26, 2021: [Docket Call]
  • April 26, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 26, 2021: [Continue ]
  • April 26, 2021: [Pretrial Services Report]
  • April 22, 2021: [Notice of Public Authority Opposition Witness]
  • April 22, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • April 22, 2021: [Order of Detention - Temporary]
  • April 22, 2021: [Initial Appearance ]
  • April 22, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 22, 2021: [Detention]
  • April 22, 2021: [Order]
  • April 22, 2021: [Oral Order]
  • April 22, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • April 22, 2021: [Arrest ]
  • April 22, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • April 22, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • April 21, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 21, 2021: [Order of Detention - Temporary]
  • April 21, 2021: [Initial Appearance ]
  • April 21, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 21, 2021: [Order]
  • April 21, 2021: [Detention]
  • April 21, 2021: [Oral Order]
  • April 21, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • April 21, 2021: [Arrest ]
  • April 21, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • April 20, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 12, 2021: [Penalty Sheet]
  • April 12, 2021: [Unredacted Document]
  • April 12, 2021: [Warrant Requested]
  • April 12, 2021: [Warrant Issued ]
  • April 12, 2021: [Indictment ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.