U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:21-cr-00161-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Gorham
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 01, 2025: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney as to 23-SO-6]
March, 2025
  • March 28, 2025: [Notice of Attorney Appearance Pursuant to 23-SO-6]
  • March 28, 2025: [Withdraw as Attorney Regarding 23-SO-6]
December, 2022
  • December 05, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • December 05, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Sentencing]
  • December 05, 2022: [Extension of Time]
  • December 05, 2022: [Continue Sentencing]
November, 2022
  • November 29, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report -Draft]
October, 2022
  • October 20, 2022: [Consent to Magistrate Arraignment]
  • October 20, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • October 20, 2022: [Arraignment ]
  • October 20, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 05, 2022: [Notice of Hearing ]
September, 2022
  • September 27, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • September 27, 2022: [Continue ]
  • September 26, 2022: [Notice of Hearing ]
  • September 22, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • September 21, 2022: [Continue ]
  • September 20, 2022: [Notice of Hearing ]
August, 2022
  • August 15, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • August 13, 2022: [Continue ]
  • August 09, 2022: [Notice of Hearing ]
June, 2022
  • June 06, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • June 06, 2022: [Continue ]
May, 2022
  • May 06, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • May 06, 2022: [Continue ]
  • May 03, 2022: [Notice of Hearing ]
April, 2022
  • April 08, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • April 08, 2022: [Continue ]
  • April 04, 2022: [Notice of Substitution of Counsel - USA]
March, 2022
  • March 30, 2022: [Notice of Hearing ]
February, 2022
  • February 22, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • February 18, 2022: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney ]
  • February 17, 2022: [Motion Submitted]
  • February 16, 2022: [Withdraw as Attorney ]
  • February 16, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • February 16, 2022: [Continue ]
  • February 16, 2022: [Docket Call]
  • February 16, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • February 01, 2022: [Notice of Hearing ]
December, 2021
  • December 08, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • December 08, 2021: [Motion Referred]
  • December 07, 2021: [Continue ]
November, 2021
  • November 23, 2021: [Notice of Hearing ]
October, 2021
  • October 27, 2021: [Scheduling Order ]
  • October 25, 2021: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • October 25, 2021: [Waiver of Detention Hearing]
  • October 22, 2021: [Pretrial Services Report]
  • October 21, 2021: [Request for Discovery]
  • October 21, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • October 21, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • October 20, 2021: [Order of Detention - Temporary]
  • October 20, 2021: [Initial Appearance ]
  • October 20, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 20, 2021: [Order]
  • October 20, 2021: [Oral Order]
  • October 20, 2021: [Detention]
  • October 20, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • October 20, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • October 20, 2021: [Arrest ]
  • October 19, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
April, 2021
  • April 12, 2021: [Warrant Issued ]
  • April 12, 2021: [Penalty Sheet]
  • April 12, 2021: [Unredacted Document]
  • April 12, 2021: [Notice of Related Case]
  • April 12, 2021: [Warrant Requested]
  • April 12, 2021: [Indictment ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.