U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:21-cr-00160-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Joyner
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2022
  • October 03, 2022: [Assembled Electronic Record on Appeal transmitted to 4CCA]
September, 2022
  • September 15, 2022: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
June, 2022
  • June 14, 2022: [Notice of Filing of Official Transcript]
  • June 14, 2022: [Transcript - Appeal]
April, 2022
  • April 26, 2022: [USCA Order]
  • April 26, 2022: [USCA Case Number ]
  • April 26, 2022: [Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to USCA]
  • April 26, 2022: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
  • April 15, 2022: [Judgment ]
  • April 15, 2022: [Sentencing ]
  • April 14, 2022: [Order on Motion to Seal ]
  • April 07, 2022: [Seal ]
  • April 07, 2022: [PROPOSED SEALED Motion]
December, 2021
  • December 13, 2021: [Continue Sentencing]
  • December 13, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Sentencing]
  • December 13, 2021: [Docket Call]
  • December 02, 2021: [Presentence Investigation Report - Final]
November, 2021
  • November 10, 2021: [Objection to PSI]
  • November 08, 2021: [Objection to PSI]
October, 2021
  • October 28, 2021: [Presentence Investigation Report -Draft]
September, 2021
  • September 03, 2021: [Plea Agreement ]
  • September 02, 2021: [Arraignment ]
  • September 02, 2021: [~Util - Plea Entered]
August, 2021
  • August 24, 2021: [Notice of Hearing ]
June, 2021
  • June 29, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • June 28, 2021: [Motion Submitted]
  • June 28, 2021: [Continue ]
  • June 03, 2021: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • June 03, 2021: [Waiver of Detention Hearing]
  • June 03, 2021: [Detention Hearing ]
  • June 03, 2021: [Pretrial Services Report]
  • June 01, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • June 01, 2021: [Scheduling Order ]
May, 2021
  • May 28, 2021: [Request for Discovery]
  • May 28, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • May 28, 2021: [Order of Detention - Temporary]
  • May 28, 2021: [Initial Appearance ]
  • May 28, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • May 28, 2021: [Text Order]
  • May 28, 2021: [Detention]
  • May 28, 2021: [Oral Order]
  • May 28, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • May 28, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • May 28, 2021: [Arrest ]
  • May 26, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
April, 2021
  • April 12, 2021: [Warrant Requested]
  • April 12, 2021: [Warrant Issued ]
  • April 12, 2021: [Penalty Sheet]
  • April 12, 2021: [Indictment ]
  • April 12, 2021: [Unredacted Document]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.