U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 7:21-cr-00052-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Dominguez-Jaramillo
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2022
  • October 14, 2022: [Judgment ]
  • October 13, 2022: [Sentencing ]
June, 2022
  • June 03, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report - Final]
May, 2022
  • May 13, 2022: [Objection to PSI]
  • May 09, 2022: [Objection to PSI]
April, 2022
  • April 13, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report -Draft]
February, 2022
  • February 22, 2022: [Order Setting/Resetting Hearings]
  • February 22, 2022: [Consent to Magistrate Arraignment]
  • February 22, 2022: [Arraignment ]
  • February 22, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
December, 2021
  • December 17, 2021: [Continue ]
  • December 13, 2021: [Notice of Hearing ]
November, 2021
  • November 08, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • November 08, 2021: [Continue ]
  • November 08, 2021: [Docket Call]
September, 2021
  • September 02, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • September 02, 2021: [Continue ]
July, 2021
  • July 28, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • July 28, 2021: [Motion Submitted]
  • July 28, 2021: [Continue ]
June, 2021
  • June 03, 2021: [Notice of Substitution of Counsel- Defendant]
  • June 01, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • June 01, 2021: [Continue ]
May, 2021
  • May 19, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
April, 2021
  • April 12, 2021: [Scheduling Order ]
  • April 12, 2021: [Penalty Sheet]
  • April 12, 2021: [Unredacted Document]
  • April 12, 2021: [Indictment ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.