U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 7:21-cr-00049-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Jennings
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 24, 2023: [Order on Motion to Seal ]
  • January 24, 2023: [Seal ]
  • January 24, 2023: [PROPOSED SEALED Document]
  • January 12, 2023: [Objection to PSI]
  • January 11, 2023: [Objection to PSI]
December, 2022
  • December 29, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report -Draft]
October, 2022
  • October 28, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • October 26, 2022: [USM Return Executed]
  • October 19, 2022: [Plea Agreement ]
  • October 19, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • October 19, 2022: [Arraignment ]
  • October 19, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 12, 2022: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued ]
  • October 12, 2022: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
September, 2022
  • September 28, 2022: [Notice of Hearing ]
August, 2022
  • August 15, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • August 15, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Document ]
June, 2022
  • June 13, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • June 10, 2022: [Extension of Time]
  • June 10, 2022: [Continue ]
May, 2022
  • May 23, 2022: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • May 23, 2022: [Text Order]
  • May 23, 2022: [Waiver of Detention Hearing]
  • May 18, 2022: [Scheduling Order ]
  • May 17, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • May 17, 2022: [Continue ]
  • May 17, 2022: [Docket Call]
  • May 17, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • May 16, 2022: [Waiver of Detention Hearing]
  • May 16, 2022: [Pretrial Services Report]
  • May 16, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • May 16, 2022: [USM Return Executed]
  • May 13, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • May 13, 2022: [Request for Discovery]
  • May 13, 2022: [Waiver-Other]
  • May 12, 2022: [Order of Detention - Temporary]
  • May 12, 2022: [Initial Appearance ]
  • May 12, 2022: [Order]
  • May 12, 2022: [Oral Order]
  • May 12, 2022: [Detention]
  • May 12, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • May 12, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • May 12, 2022: [Arrest ]
April, 2022
  • April 29, 2022: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued ]
  • April 29, 2022: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • April 29, 2022: [Application for Writ]
  • April 29, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
June, 2021
  • June 29, 2021: [Notice of Substitution of Counsel - USA]
April, 2021
  • April 12, 2021: [Warrant Issued ]
  • April 12, 2021: [Penalty Sheet]
  • April 12, 2021: [Indictment ]
  • April 12, 2021: [Unredacted Document]
  • April 12, 2021: [Warrant Requested]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.