U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 7:21-cr-00048-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Hawes
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
November, 2021
  • November 01, 2021: [Judgment ]
October, 2021
  • October 21, 2021: [Sentencing ]
September, 2021
  • September 28, 2021: [Order Setting/Resetting Hearings]
  • September 21, 2021: [Presentence Investigation Report - Final]
  • September 13, 2021: [Objection to PSI]
  • September 03, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
August, 2021
  • August 31, 2021: [Objection to PSI]
  • August 17, 2021: [Presentence Investigation Report -Draft]
  • August 06, 2021: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property ]
  • August 04, 2021: [Motion Submitted]
  • August 04, 2021: [Forfeiture of Property ]
  • August 04, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
June, 2021
  • June 18, 2021: [Order for Forfeiture of Property]
  • June 18, 2021: [Plea Agreement ]
  • June 18, 2021: [Arraignment ]
  • June 18, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • June 18, 2021: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • June 01, 2021: [Notice of Hearing ]
April, 2021
  • April 21, 2021: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • April 21, 2021: [Detention Hearing ]
  • April 21, 2021: [Pretrial Services Report]
  • April 19, 2021: [Request for Discovery]
  • April 19, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • April 19, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • April 19, 2021: [Scheduling Order ]
  • April 16, 2021: [Text Order]
  • April 16, 2021: [Oral Order]
  • April 16, 2021: [Order of Detention - Temporary]
  • April 16, 2021: [Detention]
  • April 16, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • April 16, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • April 16, 2021: [Initial Appearance ]
  • April 15, 2021: [Arrest ]
  • April 15, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 12, 2021: [Warrant Issued ]
  • April 12, 2021: [Penalty Sheet]
  • April 12, 2021: [Warrant Requested]
  • April 12, 2021: [Indictment ]
  • April 12, 2021: [Unredacted Document]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.