U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 7:21-cr-00050-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Coston et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 15, 2025: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney ]
  • May 14, 2025: [Withdraw as Attorney ]
August, 2022
  • August 23, 2022: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • August 22, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • August 12, 2022: [Judgment ]
  • August 11, 2022: [Sentencing ]
  • August 02, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report - Final]
July, 2022
  • July 29, 2022: [USCA Order]
  • July 29, 2022: [USCA Mandate]
  • July 27, 2022: [Pretrial Diversion Agreement]
  • July 25, 2022: [Deferral of Prosecution]
  • July 15, 2022: [Objection to PSI]
  • July 14, 2022: [Objection to PSI]
  • July 11, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • July 07, 2022: [Arraignment ]
  • July 07, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
June, 2022
  • June 30, 2022: [Release Status Report]
  • June 30, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report -Draft]
  • June 22, 2022: [Document]
  • June 13, 2022: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • June 13, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • June 10, 2022: [Continue ]
  • June 09, 2022: [Notice of Hearing ]
May, 2022
  • May 20, 2022: [Notice of Filing of Official Transcript]
  • May 20, 2022: [Transcript]
  • May 09, 2022: [Document]
  • May 05, 2022: [Arraignment ]
  • May 05, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • May 03, 2022: [Order on Motion to Suppress ]
April, 2022
  • April 28, 2022: [Release Status Report]
  • April 26, 2022: [Order]
  • April 08, 2022: [Response in Opposition]
March, 2022
  • March 10, 2022: [Notice of Filing of Official Transcript]
  • March 10, 2022: [Transcript - Appeal]
  • March 08, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • March 08, 2022: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • March 07, 2022: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • March 06, 2022: [Motion Submitted]
  • March 04, 2022: [Continue ]
  • March 04, 2022: [Modify Conditions of Release]
  • March 03, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • March 03, 2022: [USCA Case Number ]
  • March 02, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • March 02, 2022: [Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to USCA]
  • March 02, 2022: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
February, 2022
  • February 27, 2022: [Notice of Hearing ]
  • February 23, 2022: [Order on PROPOSED SEALED Motion]
  • February 23, 2022: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • February 23, 2022: [Judgment ]
  • February 22, 2022: [Suppress ]
  • February 22, 2022: [Sentencing ]
  • February 15, 2022: [Seal Document]
  • February 15, 2022: [PROPOSED SEALED Motion]
January, 2022
  • January 26, 2022: [Scheduling Order ]
  • January 26, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • January 26, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • January 25, 2022: [Unredacted Document]
  • January 25, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release ]
  • January 25, 2022: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • January 25, 2022: [Detention Hearing ]
  • January 24, 2022: [Motion Submitted]
  • January 24, 2022: [Pretrial Services Report]
  • January 21, 2022: [Extension of Time]
  • January 21, 2022: [Continue ]
  • January 21, 2022: [Request for Discovery]
  • January 21, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • January 21, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • January 20, 2022: [Order of Detention - Temporary]
  • January 20, 2022: [Initial Appearance ]
  • January 20, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • January 20, 2022: [Order]
  • January 20, 2022: [Oral Order]
  • January 20, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • January 20, 2022: [Detention]
  • January 20, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • January 20, 2022: [Arrest ]
  • January 20, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • January 14, 2022: [USCA Order]
  • January 12, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Sentencing]
  • January 12, 2022: [Continue Sentencing]
  • January 06, 2022: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney ]
  • January 05, 2022: [Withdraw as Attorney ]
  • January 04, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • January 03, 2022: [Order on Sealed Motion for revocation of pretrial release ]
  • January 03, 2022: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • January 03, 2022: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • January 03, 2022: [Bond Revocation Hearing ]
  • January 03, 2022: [Detention]
December, 2021
  • December 28, 2021: [Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to USCA]
  • December 27, 2021: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
  • December 27, 2021: [USCA Case Number ]
  • December 21, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release ]
  • December 21, 2021: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • December 21, 2021: [Detention Hearing ]
  • December 21, 2021: [Scheduling Order ]
  • December 21, 2021: [Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to USCA]
  • December 20, 2021: [Pretrial Services Report]
  • December 20, 2021: [Judgment ]
  • December 20, 2021: [Sentencing ]
  • December 20, 2021: [Request for Discovery]
  • December 20, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • December 20, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • December 20, 2021: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property ]
  • December 17, 2021: [Text Order]
  • December 17, 2021: [Order of Detention - Temporary]
  • December 17, 2021: [Initial Appearance ]
  • December 17, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • December 17, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • December 17, 2021: [Detention]
  • December 17, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • December 17, 2021: [Arrest ]
  • December 16, 2021: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
  • December 16, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • December 15, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Sentencing]
  • December 15, 2021: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • December 14, 2021: [Continue Sentencing]
  • December 08, 2021: [Presentence Investigation Report - Final]
November, 2021
  • November 29, 2021: [Objection to PSI]
  • November 23, 2021: [Forfeiture of Property ]
  • November 23, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • November 22, 2021: [Objection to PSI]
  • November 18, 2021: [Presentence Investigation Report - Final]
  • November 10, 2021: [PETITION and ORDER for Action on Pretrial Release]
  • November 08, 2021: [Objection to PSI]
  • November 08, 2021: [Presentence Investigation Report -Draft]
  • November 05, 2021: [Objection to PSI]
October, 2021
  • October 22, 2021: [Presentence Investigation Report -Draft]
September, 2021
  • September 21, 2021: [Plea Agreement ]
  • September 21, 2021: [Arraignment ]
  • September 21, 2021: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • September 10, 2021: [Release Status Report]
August, 2021
  • August 26, 2021: [Arraignment ]
  • August 26, 2021: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • August 09, 2021: [Motion Hearing ]
  • August 02, 2021: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • August 02, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • August 02, 2021: [Motion Submitted]
  • August 02, 2021: [Continue ]
July, 2021
  • July 28, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • July 26, 2021: [Continue ]
  • July 23, 2021: [Continue ]
  • July 23, 2021: [Notice of Deficiency]
  • July 22, 2021: [Continue ]
  • July 15, 2021: [Notice of Hearing ]
June, 2021
  • June 22, 2021: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • June 22, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • June 21, 2021: [Motion Submitted]
  • June 21, 2021: [Continue ]
  • June 14, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • June 14, 2021: [Order - Written Order Following Oral Order on Motion]
  • June 14, 2021: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • June 14, 2021: [Exhibit List ]
  • June 14, 2021: [Detention Hearing ]
  • June 11, 2021: [Release Status Report]
  • June 10, 2021: [Pretrial Services Report]
  • June 08, 2021: [Notice of Hearing ]
  • June 08, 2021: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued ]
  • June 07, 2021: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • June 07, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • June 07, 2021: [Scheduling Order ]
  • June 07, 2021: [Text Order]
  • June 07, 2021: [Order of Detention - Temporary]
  • June 07, 2021: [Detention]
  • June 07, 2021: [Oral Order]
  • June 07, 2021: [Initial Appearance ]
  • June 07, 2021: [Arrest ]
  • June 04, 2021: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued ]
  • June 04, 2021: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • June 04, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • June 01, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
May, 2021
  • May 11, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release ]
  • May 11, 2021: [Withdrawal of Motion]
  • May 11, 2021: [Detention Hearing ]
  • May 07, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • May 07, 2021: [Continue ]
  • May 07, 2021: [Docket Call]
  • May 05, 2021: [Pretrial Services Report]
  • May 04, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • May 03, 2021: [Scheduling Order ]
  • May 01, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
April, 2021
  • April 30, 2021: [Order]
  • April 30, 2021: [Oral Order]
  • April 30, 2021: [Order Setting/Resetting Hearings]
  • April 30, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • April 30, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • April 30, 2021: [Initial Appearance ]
  • April 30, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 30, 2021: [Arrest ]
  • April 12, 2021: [Penalty Sheet]
  • April 12, 2021: [Warrant Requested]
  • April 12, 2021: [Warrant Issued ]
  • April 12, 2021: [Indictment ]
  • April 12, 2021: [Unredacted Document]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.