U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 7:21-cr-00051-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Duncan et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 18, 2023: [Judgment ]
  • January 12, 2023: [Sentencing ]
  • January 05, 2023: [Presentence Investigation Report - Final]
December, 2022
  • December 12, 2022: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • December 12, 2022: [Notice of Substitution of Counsel - USA]
  • December 11, 2022: [Objection to PSI]
  • December 08, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report -Draft]
September, 2022
  • September 20, 2022: [Plea Agreement ]
  • September 20, 2022: [Arraignment ]
  • September 20, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • September 20, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
August, 2022
  • August 09, 2022: [Docket Call]
  • August 09, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • August 09, 2022: [Continue ]
May, 2022
  • May 26, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • May 24, 2022: [Continue ]
  • May 19, 2022: [Amended Judgment]
April, 2022
  • April 22, 2022: [Judgment ]
  • April 22, 2022: [Amended Judgment]
  • April 19, 2022: [Continue ]
  • April 12, 2022: [Sentencing ]
  • April 05, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report - Final]
March, 2022
  • March 17, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Sentencing]
  • March 17, 2022: [Judgment ]
  • March 16, 2022: [Continue Sentencing]
  • March 15, 2022: [Objection to PSI]
  • March 14, 2022: [Objection to PSI]
  • March 11, 2022: [Objection to PSI]
  • March 11, 2022: [Sentencing ]
  • March 04, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report - Final]
  • March 01, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report -Draft]
February, 2022
  • February 28, 2022: [Order on Motion to Seal ]
  • February 27, 2022: [Seal ]
  • February 27, 2022: [PROPOSED SEALED Motion]
  • February 15, 2022: [Objection to PSI]
  • February 11, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • February 09, 2022: [Continue ]
  • February 01, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report -Draft]
January, 2022
  • January 04, 2022: [Plea Agreement ]
  • January 04, 2022: [Arraignment ]
  • January 04, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • January 04, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
December, 2021
  • December 08, 2021: [Notice of Hearing ]
  • December 07, 2021: [Plea Agreement ]
  • December 07, 2021: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • December 07, 2021: [Arraignment ]
  • December 07, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • December 06, 2021: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney ]
  • December 03, 2021: [Withdraw as Attorney ]
  • December 01, 2021: [Continue ]
  • December 01, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • December 01, 2021: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued ]
  • December 01, 2021: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
November, 2021
  • November 08, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • November 05, 2021: [Extension of Time]
October, 2021
  • October 29, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • October 29, 2021: [Continue ]
  • October 27, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • October 25, 2021: [Continue ]
  • October 15, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • October 15, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • October 05, 2021: [Extension of Time]
  • October 05, 2021: [Continue ]
  • October 01, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
September, 2021
  • September 28, 2021: [Continue ]
  • September 27, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • September 24, 2021: [Continue ]
  • September 08, 2021: [Extension of Time]
  • September 08, 2021: [Continue ]
August, 2021
  • August 23, 2021: [Continue ]
July, 2021
  • July 23, 2021: [Continue ]
  • July 22, 2021: [Notice of Hearing ]
  • July 16, 2021: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney ]
  • July 14, 2021: [Withdraw as Attorney ]
  • July 14, 2021: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • July 12, 2021: [Notice of Substitution of Counsel- Defendant]
June, 2021
  • June 30, 2021: [Notice-other]
  • June 30, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • June 29, 2021: [Continue ]
  • June 16, 2021: [Notice of Hearing ]
  • June 10, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • June 10, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • June 10, 2021: [Extension of Time]
  • June 10, 2021: [Continue ]
  • June 04, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • June 04, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • June 04, 2021: [Extension of Time]
  • June 04, 2021: [Continue ]
May, 2021
  • May 27, 2021: [Order on Motion for Protective Order ]
  • May 26, 2021: [Notice-other]
  • May 26, 2021: [Motion Submitted]
  • May 26, 2021: [Protective Order ]
  • May 19, 2021: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • May 19, 2021: [Waiver of Detention Hearing]
  • May 19, 2021: [Detention Hearing ]
  • May 14, 2021: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • May 14, 2021: [Detention Hearing ]
  • May 14, 2021: [Waiver of Detention Hearing]
  • May 13, 2021: [Pretrial Services Report]
  • May 13, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • May 13, 2021: [Motion Referred]
  • May 13, 2021: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • May 13, 2021: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • May 13, 2021: [Waiver of Detention Hearing]
  • May 12, 2021: [Continue ]
  • May 10, 2021: [Pretrial Services Report]
  • May 10, 2021: [Request for Discovery]
  • May 10, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • May 07, 2021: [Scheduling Order ]
  • May 07, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • May 07, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • May 07, 2021: [Request for Discovery]
  • May 06, 2021: [Text Order]
  • May 06, 2021: [Oral Order]
  • May 06, 2021: [Order of Detention - Temporary]
  • May 06, 2021: [Detention]
  • May 06, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • May 06, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • May 06, 2021: [Initial Appearance ]
  • May 06, 2021: [Arrest ]
  • May 04, 2021: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued ]
  • May 04, 2021: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • May 04, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
April, 2021
  • April 12, 2021: [Penalty Sheet]
  • April 12, 2021: [Warrant Issued ]
  • April 12, 2021: [Indictment ]
  • April 12, 2021: [Unredacted Document]
  • April 12, 2021: [Warrant Requested]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.