U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:20-cr-00291-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Harvey
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
June, 2022
  • June 13, 2022: [Judgment ]
  • June 07, 2022: [Order to Surrender]
  • June 06, 2022: [Sentencing ]
May, 2022
  • May 24, 2022: [Notice of Substitution of Counsel - USA]
  • May 24, 2022: [Notice of Hearing ]
  • May 19, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report - Final]
April, 2022
  • April 19, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Sentencing]
  • April 14, 2022: [Continue Sentencing]
March, 2022
  • March 30, 2022: [Notice of Hearing ]
  • March 28, 2022: [Objection to PSI]
  • March 23, 2022: [Objection to PSI]
  • March 14, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report -Draft]
February, 2022
  • February 01, 2022: [Plea Agreement ]
January, 2022
  • January 20, 2022: [Consent to Magistrate Arraignment]
  • January 20, 2022: [Arraignment ]
  • January 20, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • January 20, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • January 13, 2022: [Release Status Report]
December, 2021
  • December 22, 2021: [Notice of Hearing ]
  • December 01, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • December 01, 2021: [Continue ]
November, 2021
  • November 22, 2021: [Notice of Hearing ]
October, 2021
  • October 26, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • October 26, 2021: [Release Status Report]
  • October 25, 2021: [Continue ]
  • October 14, 2021: [Notice of Hearing ]
September, 2021
  • September 22, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • September 21, 2021: [Motion Submitted]
  • September 21, 2021: [Continue ]
  • September 15, 2021: [Notice of Hearing ]
  • September 13, 2021: [Notice of Substitution of Counsel - USA]
August, 2021
  • August 02, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • August 02, 2021: [Docket Call]
  • August 02, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • August 02, 2021: [Continue ]
July, 2021
  • July 26, 2021: [Release Status Report]
  • July 09, 2021: [Notice of Hearing ]
June, 2021
  • June 07, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • June 07, 2021: [Motion Referred]
  • June 07, 2021: [Continue ]
  • June 04, 2021: [Release Status Report]
  • June 04, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
May, 2021
  • May 11, 2021: [Notice of Hearing ]
April, 2021
  • April 16, 2021: [Scheduling Order ]
  • April 16, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • April 14, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release ]
  • April 14, 2021: [Initial Appearance ]
  • April 14, 2021: [Oral Order]
  • April 14, 2021: [Order]
  • April 14, 2021: [Order on Motion to Unseal Case ]
  • April 14, 2021: [Arrest ]
  • April 14, 2021: [Unseal Case]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.