U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:21-cr-00148-2
  • Case Name: USA v. Webb et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 18, 2025: [USCA Mandate]
March, 2025
  • March 27, 2025: [USCA Judgment]
  • March 27, 2025: [Opinion from USCA]
  • March 14, 2025: [Assembled Electronic Record on Appeal transmitted to 4CCA]
December, 2022
  • December 29, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Sentencing]
  • December 23, 2022: [Continue Sentencing]
  • December 12, 2022: [Objection to PSI]
  • December 02, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • December 01, 2022: [Extension of Time]
November, 2022
  • November 28, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report -Draft]
October, 2022
  • October 12, 2022: [SEALED Document]
  • October 12, 2022: [Plea Agreement ]
  • October 04, 2022: [Waiver of Indictment ]
  • October 04, 2022: [Consent to Magistrate Arraignment]
  • October 04, 2022: [Arraignment ]
  • October 04, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • October 04, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 04, 2022: [Information - Felony]
  • October 04, 2022: [Penalty Sheet]
  • October 03, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • October 03, 2022: [Order on Motion to Expedite ]
September, 2022
  • September 30, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • September 30, 2022: [Expedite ]
  • September 30, 2022: [Extension of Time]
  • September 29, 2022: [Order on Motion for Release from Custody ]
  • September 28, 2022: [Release from Custody ]
August, 2022
  • August 08, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • August 08, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • August 02, 2022: [Continue ]
  • August 02, 2022: [Extension of Time]
July, 2022
  • July 29, 2022: [Extension of Time]
  • July 22, 2022: [Notice of Hearing ]
  • July 12, 2022: [Notice-other]
  • July 01, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
June, 2022
  • June 30, 2022: [Continue ]
  • June 29, 2022: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • June 28, 2022: [Continue ]
  • June 24, 2022: [Notice of Hearing ]
  • June 16, 2022: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration ]
  • June 14, 2022: [Continue ]
  • June 10, 2022: [Order on Motion for Hearing ]
  • June 07, 2022: [Hearing ]
May, 2022
  • May 29, 2022: [Reconsideration ]
  • May 26, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • May 26, 2022: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney ]
  • May 26, 2022: [Withdraw as Attorney ]
  • May 24, 2022: [Extension of Time]
  • May 20, 2022: [Mail Returned]
  • May 17, 2022: [Notice of Special Appearance - Defendant - Non-District Counsel]
  • May 17, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • May 17, 2022: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney ]
  • May 16, 2022: [Withdraw as Attorney ]
  • May 10, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • May 10, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • May 07, 2022: [Continue ]
  • May 07, 2022: [Extension of Time]
  • May 04, 2022: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • May 02, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
April, 2022
  • April 05, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • April 05, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • April 05, 2022: [Continue ]
  • April 05, 2022: [Extension of Time]
  • April 02, 2022: [Notice of Substitution of Counsel - USA]
March, 2022
  • March 03, 2022: [Extension of Time]
  • March 03, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • March 03, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • March 02, 2022: [Continue ]
  • March 02, 2022: [Extension of Time]
  • March 01, 2022: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney ]
February, 2022
  • February 28, 2022: [Withdraw as Attorney ]
  • February 18, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • February 02, 2022: [Order on Motion for Protective Order ]
  • February 01, 2022: [Protective Order ]
January, 2022
  • January 24, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • January 24, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • January 24, 2022: [Notice-other]
  • January 22, 2022: [Continue ]
  • January 22, 2022: [Extension of Time]
December, 2021
  • December 14, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • December 14, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • December 14, 2021: [Continue ]
  • December 14, 2021: [Extension of Time]
November, 2021
  • November 23, 2021: [Notice of Hearing ]
  • November 19, 2021: [Arraignment ]
  • November 19, 2021: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • November 01, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • November 01, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
October, 2021
  • October 30, 2021: [Continue ]
  • October 30, 2021: [Extension of Time]
  • October 25, 2021: [Notice of Hearing ]
September, 2021
  • September 23, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • September 23, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • September 22, 2021: [Extension of Time]
  • September 22, 2021: [Continue ]
  • September 15, 2021: [Notice of Hearing ]
  • September 14, 2021: [Notice of Substitution of Counsel - USA]
August, 2021
  • August 19, 2021: [Request for Discovery]
  • August 19, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • August 18, 2021: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney ]
  • August 17, 2021: [Withdraw as Attorney ]
July, 2021
  • July 29, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • July 28, 2021: [Continue ]
  • July 12, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • July 12, 2021: [Continue ]
  • July 09, 2021: [Notice of Hearing ]
June, 2021
  • June 09, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • June 08, 2021: [Extension of Time]
  • June 03, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • June 03, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • June 02, 2021: [Motion Referred]
  • June 02, 2021: [Continue ]
May, 2021
  • May 27, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • May 25, 2021: [Extension of Time]
  • May 13, 2021: [Text Order]
  • May 13, 2021: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • May 13, 2021: [Waiver of Detention Hearing]
  • May 13, 2021: [Detention Hearing ]
  • May 11, 2021: [Notice of Hearing ]
  • May 10, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • May 07, 2021: [Motion Submitted]
  • May 07, 2021: [Extension of Time]
  • May 05, 2021: [Oral Order]
  • May 05, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • May 05, 2021: [Docket Call]
April, 2021
  • April 29, 2021: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney ]
  • April 28, 2021: [Motion Submitted]
  • April 28, 2021: [Withdraw as Attorney ]
  • April 27, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • April 15, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • April 15, 2021: [Docket Call]
  • April 15, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 15, 2021: [Continue ]
  • April 15, 2021: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • April 15, 2021: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • April 14, 2021: [Waiver of Detention Hearing]
  • April 14, 2021: [Pretrial Services Report]
  • April 14, 2021: [Request for Discovery]
  • April 14, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • April 13, 2021: [Scheduling Order ]
  • April 13, 2021: [Text Order]
  • April 13, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.