U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:21-cr-00171-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Anderson
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 03, 2022: [Transcript - Appeal]
October, 2022
  • October 26, 2022: [Notice of Filing of Official Transcript]
  • October 26, 2022: [Transcript - Appeal]
September, 2022
  • September 06, 2022: [USCA Order]
July, 2022
  • July 08, 2022: [USCA Case Number ]
  • July 06, 2022: [Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to USCA]
  • July 05, 2022: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
June, 2022
  • June 28, 2022: [Judgment ]
  • June 22, 2022: [Sentencing ]
  • June 22, 2022: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • June 21, 2022: [Seal Document]
  • June 21, 2022: [PROPOSED SEALED Document]
  • June 21, 2022: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property ]
  • June 17, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum (NOT SEALED)]
  • June 17, 2022: [Seal Document]
  • June 17, 2022: [PROPOSED SEALED Document]
  • June 09, 2022: [Notice of Hearing ]
  • June 09, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report - Final]
  • June 08, 2022: [Forfeiture of Property ]
  • June 08, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • June 02, 2022: [Objection to PSI]
May, 2022
  • May 27, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • May 26, 2022: [Objection to PSI]
  • May 25, 2022: [Extension of Time]
  • May 11, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report -Draft]
April, 2022
  • April 06, 2022: [Plea Agreement ]
March, 2022
  • March 23, 2022: [Consent to Magistrate Arraignment]
  • March 23, 2022: [Arraignment ]
  • March 23, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 23, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • March 03, 2022: [Notice of Hearing ]
February, 2022
  • February 01, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
January, 2022
  • January 28, 2022: [Extension of Time]
December, 2021
  • December 21, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • December 21, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • December 20, 2021: [Extension of Time]
  • December 20, 2021: [Continue ]
November, 2021
  • November 05, 2021: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney ]
  • November 04, 2021: [Withdraw as Attorney ]
  • November 02, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • November 02, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • November 01, 2021: [Motion Submitted]
  • November 01, 2021: [Continue ]
  • November 01, 2021: [Extension of Time]
  • November 01, 2021: [Request for Discovery]
  • November 01, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
October, 2021
  • October 25, 2021: [Notice of Hearing ]
  • October 19, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • October 18, 2021: [Extension of Time]
  • October 14, 2021: [Exhibit List ]
  • October 14, 2021: [Order - Written Order Following Oral Order on Motion]
  • October 14, 2021: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • October 14, 2021: [Detention Hearing ]
  • October 06, 2021: [Motion Referred]
  • October 06, 2021: [Continue ]
September, 2021
  • September 29, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • September 29, 2021: [Continue ]
  • September 29, 2021: [Docket Call]
  • September 29, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • September 28, 2021: [Pretrial Services Report]
  • September 27, 2021: [Scheduling Order ]
  • September 21, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • September 21, 2021: [Text Order]
  • September 21, 2021: [Order of Detention - Temporary]
  • September 21, 2021: [Initial Appearance ]
  • September 21, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • September 21, 2021: [Detention]
  • September 21, 2021: [Arrest ]
  • September 16, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • September 08, 2021: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • September 07, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
April, 2021
  • April 15, 2021: [Warrant Issued ]
  • April 15, 2021: [Penalty Sheet]
  • April 15, 2021: [Indictment ]
  • April 15, 2021: [Unredacted Document]
  • April 15, 2021: [Notice of Related Case]
  • April 15, 2021: [Warrant Requested]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.