U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:21-cr-00170-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Martin
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 20, 2025: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • May 16, 2025: [Continue ]
April, 2025
  • April 18, 2025: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • April 17, 2025: [Motion Submitted]
  • April 16, 2025: [Continue ]
  • April 10, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • April 07, 2025: [Extension of Time]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • March 31, 2025: [Waiver of Detention Hearing]
  • March 26, 2025: [Waiver of Detention Hearing]
  • March 26, 2025: [Scheduling Order ]
  • March 25, 2025: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • March 25, 2025: [Continue ]
  • March 24, 2025: [Request for Discovery]
  • March 24, 2025: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • March 21, 2025: [Pretrial Services Report]
  • March 21, 2025: [Text Order]
  • March 21, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 19, 2025: [Order of Detention - Temporary]
  • March 19, 2025: [Initial Appearance ]
  • March 19, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 19, 2025: [Order]
  • March 19, 2025: [Oral Order]
  • March 19, 2025: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • March 19, 2025: [Detention]
  • March 19, 2025: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • March 18, 2025: [Rule 5(c)(3) Documents Received ]
  • March 18, 2025: [Arrest - Other District ]
May, 2021
  • May 20, 2021: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • May 19, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
April, 2021
  • April 15, 2021: [Warrant Issued ]
  • April 15, 2021: [Penalty Sheet]
  • April 15, 2021: [Notice of Related Case]
  • April 15, 2021: [Warrant Requested]
  • April 15, 2021: [Indictment ]
  • April 15, 2021: [Unredacted Document]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.