U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:21-cr-00169-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Talbert
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 17, 2023: [Notice of Hearing ]
  • January 03, 2023: [Notice of Hearing ]
December, 2022
  • December 16, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • December 16, 2022: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • December 16, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • December 14, 2022: [Text Order]
September, 2022
  • September 01, 2022: [Order on SEALED Motion]
  • September 01, 2022: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
August, 2022
  • August 31, 2022: [Seal Document]
  • August 31, 2022: [PROPOSED SEALED Motion]
  • August 30, 2022: [Notice of Hearing ]
June, 2022
  • June 01, 2022: [SEALED Order]
  • June 01, 2022: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • June 01, 2022: [Seal Document]
  • June 01, 2022: [PROPOSED SEALED Document]
May, 2022
  • May 27, 2022: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • May 27, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report - Final]
  • May 26, 2022: [Seal Document]
  • May 26, 2022: [PROPOSED SEALED Document]
  • May 25, 2022: [Seal Document]
  • May 25, 2022: [PROPOSED SEALED Document]
  • May 24, 2022: [Notice of Hearing ]
  • May 16, 2022: [Objection to PSI]
  • May 10, 2022: [Notice-other]
  • May 02, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report -Draft]
March, 2022
  • March 10, 2022: [Plea Agreement ]
  • March 09, 2022: [Consent to Magistrate Arraignment]
  • March 09, 2022: [Arraignment ]
  • March 09, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • March 09, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 02, 2022: [Release Status Report]
February, 2022
  • February 18, 2022: [Notice of Hearing ]
December, 2021
  • December 27, 2021: [Order on PROPOSED SEALED Motion]
  • December 27, 2021: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • December 22, 2021: [Seal Document]
  • December 22, 2021: [PROPOSED SEALED Motion]
  • December 20, 2021: [Notice of Hearing ]
November, 2021
  • November 02, 2021: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • November 01, 2021: [Modify Conditions of Release]
September, 2021
  • September 16, 2021: [Order on PROPOSED SEALED Motion]
  • September 16, 2021: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • September 16, 2021: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • September 15, 2021: [Seal Document]
  • September 15, 2021: [PROPOSED SEALED Motion]
  • September 15, 2021: [Notice of Hearing ]
June, 2021
  • June 29, 2021: [Order on PROPOSED SEALED Motion]
  • June 29, 2021: [Order on Motion to Seal ]
  • June 28, 2021: [Motion Submitted]
  • June 28, 2021: [Seal ]
  • June 28, 2021: [PROPOSED SEALED Motion]
  • June 22, 2021: [PETITION and ORDER for Action on Pretrial Release]
  • June 14, 2021: [Notice of Hearing ]
May, 2021
  • May 10, 2021: [Scheduling Order ]
  • May 07, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • May 07, 2021: [Request for Discovery]
  • May 06, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • May 06, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release ]
  • May 06, 2021: [Initial Appearance ]
  • May 06, 2021: [Order]
  • May 06, 2021: [Oral Order]
  • May 06, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • May 06, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • May 06, 2021: [Arrest ]
  • May 05, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
April, 2021
  • April 15, 2021: [Penalty Sheet]
  • April 15, 2021: [Notice of Related Case]
  • April 15, 2021: [Warrant Requested]
  • April 15, 2021: [Warrant Issued ]
  • April 15, 2021: [Indictment ]
  • April 15, 2021: [Unredacted Document]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.