U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:21-cr-00168-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Daniels
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
February, 2022
  • February 01, 2022: [Judgment ]
January, 2022
  • January 26, 2022: [Exhibit List ]
  • January 26, 2022: [Sentencing ]
December, 2021
  • December 13, 2021: [Order on PROPOSED SEALED Motion]
  • December 13, 2021: [Order on Motion to Seal ]
  • December 09, 2021: [Presentence Investigation Report - Final]
  • December 08, 2021: [Seal ]
  • December 08, 2021: [PROPOSED SEALED Motion]
November, 2021
  • November 29, 2021: [Objection to PSI]
  • November 18, 2021: [Order on Motion for Release from Custody ]
  • November 17, 2021: [Motion Submitted]
  • November 17, 2021: [Release from Custody ]
  • November 08, 2021: [Objection to PSI]
October, 2021
  • October 27, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Sentencing]
  • October 26, 2021: [Extension of Time]
  • October 26, 2021: [Continue Sentencing]
  • October 12, 2021: [Presentence Investigation Report -Draft]
August, 2021
  • August 18, 2021: [Plea Agreement ]
  • August 18, 2021: [Arraignment ]
  • August 18, 2021: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • August 18, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
June, 2021
  • June 18, 2021: [Extension of Time]
  • June 18, 2021: [Continue ]
  • June 16, 2021: [Notice of Hearing ]
May, 2021
  • May 19, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • May 19, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • May 18, 2021: [Extension of Time]
  • May 18, 2021: [Continue ]
April, 2021
  • April 27, 2021: [Detention]
  • April 27, 2021: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • April 27, 2021: [Detention Hearing ]
  • April 27, 2021: [Scheduling Order ]
  • April 26, 2021: [Pretrial Services Report]
  • April 22, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • April 22, 2021: [Request for Discovery]
  • April 21, 2021: [Order]
  • April 21, 2021: [Oral Order]
  • April 21, 2021: [Order of Detention - Temporary]
  • April 21, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • April 21, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • April 21, 2021: [Initial Appearance ]
  • April 20, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • April 19, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 19, 2021: [Arrest ]
  • April 15, 2021: [Warrant Issued ]
  • April 15, 2021: [Penalty Sheet]
  • April 15, 2021: [Indictment ]
  • April 15, 2021: [Unredacted Document]
  • April 15, 2021: [Warrant Requested]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.