U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:21-cr-00167-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Driver
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 21, 2022: [Plea Agreement ]
July, 2022
  • July 18, 2022: [Judgment ]
  • July 18, 2022: [Document]
  • July 11, 2022: [Sentencing ]
  • July 11, 2022: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property ]
  • July 08, 2022: [Forfeiture of Property ]
  • July 08, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
June, 2022
  • June 30, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report - Final]
  • June 24, 2022: [Notice of Hearing ]
  • June 22, 2022: [Objection to PSI]
  • June 21, 2022: [Objection to PSI]
  • June 06, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report -Draft]
April, 2022
  • April 07, 2022: [Consent to Magistrate Arraignment]
  • April 07, 2022: [Arraignment ]
  • April 07, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • April 07, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
March, 2022
  • March 21, 2022: [Notice of Hearing ]
February, 2022
  • February 02, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • February 02, 2022: [Continue ]
January, 2022
  • January 25, 2022: [Notice of Hearing ]
November, 2021
  • November 23, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • November 23, 2021: [Motion Referred]
  • November 23, 2021: [Continue ]
  • November 12, 2021: [Notice of Hearing ]
October, 2021
  • October 15, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • October 15, 2021: [Continue ]
  • October 04, 2021: [Notice of Hearing ]
July, 2021
  • July 28, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • July 28, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • July 28, 2021: [Motion Submitted]
  • July 27, 2021: [Extension of Time]
  • July 27, 2021: [Continue ]
June, 2021
  • June 29, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • June 28, 2021: [Pretrial Services Report]
  • June 25, 2021: [Request for Discovery]
  • June 25, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • June 25, 2021: [Scheduling Order ]
  • June 24, 2021: [Initial Appearance ]
  • June 24, 2021: [Order]
  • June 24, 2021: [Oral Order]
  • June 24, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • June 23, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
May, 2021
  • May 03, 2021: [Arrest - Other District ]
  • May 03, 2021: [Rule 5(c)(3) Documents Received ]
April, 2021
  • April 15, 2021: [Warrant Issued ]
  • April 15, 2021: [Penalty Sheet]
  • April 15, 2021: [Indictment ]
  • April 15, 2021: [Unredacted Document]
  • April 15, 2021: [Warrant Requested]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.