U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:21-cr-00166-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Cunningham
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 15, 2025: [Opinion from USCA]
January, 2023
  • January 03, 2023: [USCA Mandate]
December, 2022
  • December 15, 2022: [Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • December 15, 2022: [Plea Agreement ]
  • December 15, 2022: [Change of Plea Hearing ]
  • December 15, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • December 12, 2022: [Notice of Hearing ]
  • December 12, 2022: [USCA Judgment]
  • December 12, 2022: [USCA Order]
  • December 06, 2022: [Withdrawal of Motion]
November, 2022
  • November 14, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • November 10, 2022: [Notification to Appeals Court of Filing]
  • November 09, 2022: [Order]
  • November 07, 2022: [Notice-other]
September, 2022
  • September 13, 2022: [Transcript]
July, 2022
  • July 28, 2022: [Order Setting/Resetting Hearings]
  • July 12, 2022: [Notice of Filing of Official Transcript]
  • July 12, 2022: [Transcript]
June, 2022
  • June 30, 2022: [Response to Motion]
  • June 22, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • June 17, 2022: [Notice-other]
  • June 17, 2022: [USCA Case Number ]
  • June 17, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • June 16, 2022: [Assembled Electronic Record on Appeal transmitted to 4CCA]
  • June 16, 2022: [Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to USCA]
  • June 16, 2022: [Notice of Appeal - Interlocutory]
  • June 16, 2022: [Dismiss ]
  • June 16, 2022: [Speedy Trial ]
  • June 03, 2022: [Order on Motion to Dismiss ]
  • June 03, 2022: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration ]
  • June 03, 2022: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • June 03, 2022: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • June 03, 2022: [Exhibit List ]
  • June 03, 2022: [Motion Hearing ]
  • June 01, 2022: [Notice-other]
May, 2022
  • May 24, 2022: [Notice of Hearing on Motion ]
  • May 12, 2022: [Response to Motion]
  • May 11, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • May 10, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
April, 2022
  • April 28, 2022: [Remark]
  • April 27, 2022: [Mail Returned]
  • April 27, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 27, 2022: [Reply to Response ]
  • April 18, 2022: [Order]
  • April 14, 2022: [Response to Motion]
  • April 08, 2022: [Detention Hearing ]
  • April 08, 2022: [Appoint Counsel ]
March, 2022
  • March 31, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • March 31, 2022: [Reconsideration ]
  • March 31, 2022: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • March 31, 2022: [Dismiss ]
  • March 24, 2022: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • March 23, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • March 23, 2022: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • March 23, 2022: [Arraignment ]
  • March 23, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • March 23, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 23, 2022: [Reconsideration ]
  • March 14, 2022: [Response in Opposition]
  • March 07, 2022: [Order on Motion to Suppress ]
  • March 07, 2022: [Order on Motion to Dismiss ]
  • March 07, 2022: [Letter]
  • March 07, 2022: [Dismiss ]
  • March 03, 2022: [Notice of Hearing ]
  • March 02, 2022: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • March 01, 2022: [Suppress ]
February, 2022
  • February 28, 2022: [Letter]
  • February 28, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • February 25, 2022: [Dismiss ]
  • February 22, 2022: [Extension of Time]
  • February 17, 2022: [Dismiss ]
  • February 17, 2022: [Suppress ]
January, 2022
  • January 24, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • January 19, 2022: [Continue ]
December, 2021
  • December 20, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • December 17, 2021: [Continue ]
November, 2021
  • November 23, 2021: [Letter]
  • November 22, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • November 19, 2021: [Continue ]
October, 2021
  • October 22, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • October 22, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • October 21, 2021: [Extension of Time]
  • October 21, 2021: [Continue ]
  • October 19, 2021: [Waiver of Initial Appearance on Superseding Indictment]
  • October 14, 2021: [Notice of Substitution of Counsel - USA]
September, 2021
  • September 30, 2021: [Notice of Waiver of Initial Appearance on Superseding Indictment]
  • September 30, 2021: [Unredacted Document]
  • September 30, 2021: [Penalty Sheet]
  • September 30, 2021: [Indictment ]
  • September 23, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • September 23, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • September 22, 2021: [Extension of Time]
  • September 22, 2021: [Continue ]
July, 2021
  • July 26, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • July 26, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • July 23, 2021: [Extension of Time]
  • July 23, 2021: [Continue ]
May, 2021
  • May 27, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • May 27, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • May 25, 2021: [Motion Submitted]
  • May 25, 2021: [Extension of Time]
  • May 25, 2021: [Continue ]
  • May 24, 2021: [Notice of Hearing ]
  • May 07, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • May 07, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • May 03, 2021: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • May 03, 2021: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • May 03, 2021: [Waiver of Detention Hearing]
April, 2021
  • April 26, 2021: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • April 26, 2021: [Scheduling Order ]
  • April 26, 2021: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued ]
  • April 23, 2021: [Pretrial Services Report]
  • April 23, 2021: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • April 23, 2021: [Text Order]
  • April 22, 2021: [Request for Discovery]
  • April 22, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • April 22, 2021: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued ]
  • April 22, 2021: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • April 21, 2021: [Order of Detention - Temporary]
  • April 21, 2021: [Initial Appearance ]
  • April 21, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 21, 2021: [Oral Order]
  • April 21, 2021: [Order]
  • April 21, 2021: [Arrest ]
  • April 21, 2021: [Detention]
  • April 20, 2021: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued ]
  • April 20, 2021: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • April 20, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 15, 2021: [Penalty Sheet]
  • April 15, 2021: [Unredacted Document]
  • April 15, 2021: [Warrant Requested]
  • April 15, 2021: [Warrant Issued ]
  • April 15, 2021: [Indictment ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.