U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:21-cr-00029-1
  • Case Name: USA v. McGhee
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 13, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • May 12, 2025: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • May 05, 2025: [Letter]
  • May 05, 2025: [Appoint Counsel ]
April, 2025
  • April 18, 2025: [Rule 12 Letter]
  • April 18, 2025: [Notice of Deficiency]
  • April 18, 2025: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • April 18, 2025: [Dismiss ]
  • April 14, 2025: [Letter]
  • April 07, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • April 07, 2025: [Notice of Filing of Official Transcript]
  • April 07, 2025: [Transcript]
March, 2025
  • March 26, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • March 26, 2025: [Motion Submitted]
  • March 26, 2025: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
January, 2023
  • January 25, 2023: [Notice of Hearing on Motion ]
  • January 25, 2023: [Order Setting/Resetting Hearings]
  • January 24, 2023: [Response to Order]
  • January 23, 2023: [Letter]
  • January 23, 2023: [Withdraw as Attorney ]
  • January 22, 2023: [Notice of Hearing ]
  • January 20, 2023: [Order]
  • January 20, 2023: [Motion Referred]
  • January 20, 2023: [Motion Referred to Clerk]
  • January 19, 2023: [Letter]
  • January 19, 2023: [Withdraw as Attorney ]
  • January 05, 2023: [PETITION and ORDER for Action on Pretrial Release]
December, 2022
  • December 20, 2022: [Notice of Substitution of Counsel - USA]
  • December 15, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • December 15, 2022: [Continue ]
October, 2022
  • October 18, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • October 18, 2022: [Continue ]
August, 2022
  • August 23, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • August 23, 2022: [Continue ]
June, 2022
  • June 21, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • June 21, 2022: [Continue ]
May, 2022
  • May 12, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release ]
  • May 12, 2022: [Bond Hearing ]
  • May 05, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • May 05, 2022: [Continue ]
April, 2022
  • April 29, 2022: [Notice Regarding US Passport]
  • April 07, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 07, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release ]
  • April 07, 2022: [Detention Hearing ]
  • April 06, 2022: [Pretrial Services Report]
  • April 05, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • April 05, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • April 05, 2022: [Request for Discovery]
  • April 04, 2022: [Scheduling Order ]
  • April 04, 2022: [Order]
  • April 04, 2022: [Oral Order]
  • April 04, 2022: [Order of Detention - Temporary]
  • April 04, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • April 04, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • April 04, 2022: [Detention]
  • April 04, 2022: [Initial Appearance ]
  • April 04, 2022: [Arrest ]
April, 2021
  • April 15, 2021: [Penalty Sheet]
  • April 15, 2021: [Unredacted Document]
  • April 15, 2021: [Warrant Requested]
  • April 15, 2021: [Warrant Issued ]
  • April 15, 2021: [Indictment ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.