U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 7:20-cr-00074-3
  • Case Name: USA v. Parker, et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 21, 2022: [Notice-other]
August, 2022
  • August 03, 2022: [Judgment ]
July, 2022
  • July 28, 2022: [Sentencing ]
  • July 18, 2022: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property ]
  • July 15, 2022: [Forfeiture of Property ]
  • July 15, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • July 14, 2022: [Notice of Substitution of Counsel - USA]
June, 2022
  • June 02, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report - Final]
May, 2022
  • May 24, 2022: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • May 24, 2022: [SEALED Order]
  • May 24, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • May 23, 2022: [Seal Document]
  • May 23, 2022: [PROPOSED SEALED Motion]
  • May 20, 2022: [USCA Mandate]
  • May 17, 2022: [Objection to PSI]
  • May 16, 2022: [Objection to PSI]
  • May 03, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report -Draft]
April, 2022
  • April 28, 2022: [USCA Judgment]
  • April 28, 2022: [Opinion from USCA]
March, 2022
  • March 08, 2022: [Plea Agreement ]
  • March 08, 2022: [Arraignment ]
  • March 08, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • March 08, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
February, 2022
  • February 11, 2022: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
January, 2022
  • January 28, 2022: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
December, 2021
  • December 27, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • December 21, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • December 20, 2021: [Motion Submitted]
  • December 20, 2021: [Assembled Electronic Record on Appeal transmitted to 4CCA]
  • December 18, 2021: [Continue ]
November, 2021
  • November 10, 2021: [Transcript - Appeal]
  • November 05, 2021: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • November 05, 2021: [Continue ]
  • November 05, 2021: [Extension of Time]
  • November 01, 2021: [Notice of Filing of Official Transcript]
  • November 01, 2021: [Transcript - Appeal]
October, 2021
  • October 26, 2021: [Motion Submitted]
  • October 05, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • October 04, 2021: [Continue ]
  • October 04, 2021: [Extension of Time]
  • October 01, 2021: [USCA Order]
  • October 01, 2021: [USCA Case Number ]
September, 2021
  • September 28, 2021: [Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to USCA]
  • September 28, 2021: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
  • September 27, 2021: [Judgment ]
  • September 20, 2021: [Exhibit List ]
  • September 20, 2021: [Sentencing ]
  • September 13, 2021: [Modification to Presentence Investigation Report]
August, 2021
  • August 31, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • August 26, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • August 26, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • August 25, 2021: [Continue ]
  • August 25, 2021: [Extension of Time]
  • August 24, 2021: [Notice of Hearing ]
  • August 11, 2021: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • August 11, 2021: [Detention Hearing ]
  • August 03, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • August 03, 2021: [Motion Referred]
  • August 03, 2021: [Continue ]
  • August 03, 2021: [Pretrial Services Report]
  • August 02, 2021: [Request for Discovery]
  • August 02, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
July, 2021
  • July 30, 2021: [Scheduling Order ]
  • July 29, 2021: [Text Order]
  • July 29, 2021: [Order of Detention - Temporary]
  • July 29, 2021: [Detention]
  • July 29, 2021: [Oral Order]
  • July 29, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • July 29, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • July 29, 2021: [Initial Appearance ]
  • July 29, 2021: [Arrest ]
  • July 27, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • July 20, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
June, 2021
  • June 30, 2021: [SEALED Order]
  • June 30, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • June 29, 2021: [Seal ]
  • June 29, 2021: [PROPOSED SEALED Motion]
  • June 25, 2021: [Notice of Substitution of Counsel - USA]
  • June 17, 2021: [Notice of Hearing ]
May, 2021
  • May 20, 2021: [Letter]
April, 2021
  • April 22, 2021: [SEALED Document]
  • April 22, 2021: [Arrest - Other District ]
  • April 22, 2021: [Rule 5(c)(3) Documents Received ]
  • April 20, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • April 19, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 19, 2021: [SEALED Order]
  • April 19, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • April 19, 2021: [Order to Unseal Indictment]
  • April 19, 2021: [Unseal Indictment]
  • April 19, 2021: [Seal ]
  • April 19, 2021: [PROPOSED SEALED Motion]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.