U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:21-cr-00184-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Cruz-Santillan
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
July, 2022
  • July 29, 2022: [Judgment ]
  • July 26, 2022: [Waiver of Indictment ]
  • July 26, 2022: [Plea Agreement ]
  • July 26, 2022: [Arraignment ]
  • July 26, 2022: [Sentencing ]
  • July 26, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • July 18, 2022: [Penalty Sheet]
  • July 18, 2022: [Information - Felony]
  • July 16, 2022: [Waiver of Presentence Investigation Report ]
  • July 05, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • July 02, 2022: [Continue ]
June, 2022
  • June 22, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • June 16, 2022: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney ]
  • June 14, 2022: [Withdraw as Attorney ]
April, 2022
  • April 14, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • April 13, 2022: [Continue ]
  • April 13, 2022: [Extension of Time]
February, 2022
  • February 01, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • February 01, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
January, 2022
  • January 31, 2022: [Continue ]
  • January 31, 2022: [Extension of Time]
November, 2021
  • November 29, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • November 29, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • November 28, 2021: [Continue ]
  • November 28, 2021: [Extension of Time]
October, 2021
  • October 08, 2021: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney ]
  • October 07, 2021: [Withdraw as Attorney ]
September, 2021
  • September 30, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • September 27, 2021: [Motion Submitted]
  • September 27, 2021: [Continue ]
August, 2021
  • August 17, 2021: [Continue ]
  • August 13, 2021: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
July, 2021
  • July 20, 2021: [Continue ]
June, 2021
  • June 09, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • June 03, 2021: [Notice of Substitution of Counsel- Defendant]
  • June 02, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • June 02, 2021: [Continue ]
  • June 01, 2021: [Notice of Hearing ]
May, 2021
  • May 12, 2021: [Transcript]
  • May 12, 2021: [Notice of Filing of Official Transcript]
April, 2021
  • April 27, 2021: [Scheduling Order ]
  • April 21, 2021: [Penalty Sheet]
  • April 21, 2021: [Indictment ]
  • April 21, 2021: [Unredacted Document]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.