U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:21-cr-00183-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Brown
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 12, 2022: [Judgment 2255]
November, 2022
  • November 15, 2022: [Case Referred to Judge]
October, 2022
  • October 19, 2022: [Notice of Mailing Recommendation]
  • October 19, 2022: [Recommended Ruling - Magistrate Judge]
August, 2022
  • August 30, 2022: [Notice-other]
  • August 30, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
July, 2022
  • July 13, 2022: [Judgment ]
  • July 13, 2022: [Sentencing ]
May, 2022
  • May 24, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Sentencing]
  • May 24, 2022: [Continue Sentencing]
  • May 05, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report - Final]
April, 2022
  • April 22, 2022: [Objection to PSI]
  • April 22, 2022: [Case Referred for Screening]
  • April 21, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 19, 2022: [Objection to PSI]
  • April 07, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report -Draft]
February, 2022
  • February 18, 2022: [Document]
  • February 18, 2022: [Plea Agreement ]
  • February 18, 2022: [Arraignment ]
  • February 18, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • February 18, 2022: [Waiver of Indictment ]
  • February 18, 2022: [Information - Felony]
  • February 18, 2022: [Amended Penalty Sheet]
December, 2021
  • December 11, 2021: [Arraignment ]
  • December 11, 2021: [~Util - Plea Entered]
November, 2021
  • November 30, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Sentencing]
  • November 30, 2021: [Continue Sentencing]
September, 2021
  • September 16, 2021: [Continue ]
  • September 10, 2021: [Continue ]
August, 2021
  • August 13, 2021: [Notice of Substitution of Counsel - USA]
June, 2021
  • June 29, 2021: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • June 24, 2021: [Continue ]
  • June 23, 2021: [Notice of Hearing ]
  • June 02, 2021: [Order on Motion for Protective Order ]
  • June 01, 2021: [Order - Written Order Following Oral Order on Motion]
May, 2021
  • May 28, 2021: [Motion Submitted]
  • May 28, 2021: [Protective Order ]
  • May 21, 2021: [Detention Hearing ]
  • May 21, 2021: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • May 18, 2021: [Continue ]
  • May 12, 2021: [Scheduling Order ]
  • May 10, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • May 10, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • May 10, 2021: [Motion Referred]
  • May 10, 2021: [Continue ]
  • May 10, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • May 10, 2021: [Pretrial Services Report]
  • May 07, 2021: [Order of Detention - Temporary]
  • May 07, 2021: [Text Order]
  • May 07, 2021: [Initial Appearance ]
  • May 07, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • May 07, 2021: [Detention]
  • May 07, 2021: [Order]
  • May 07, 2021: [Arrest ]
  • May 04, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
April, 2021
  • April 21, 2021: [Warrant Issued ]
  • April 21, 2021: [Penalty Sheet]
  • April 21, 2021: [Indictment ]
  • April 21, 2021: [Unredacted Document]
  • April 21, 2021: [Warrant Requested]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.