U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:21-cr-00182-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Zavaleta-Castro
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2021
  • December 27, 2021: [Notice-other]
October, 2021
  • October 06, 2021: [Judgment ]
  • October 06, 2021: [Sentencing ]
September, 2021
  • September 29, 2021: [Presentence Investigation Report - Final]
  • September 27, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • September 17, 2021: [Docket Annotation]
  • September 13, 2021: [Objection to PSI]
  • September 01, 2021: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property ]
  • September 01, 2021: [Motion Submitted]
August, 2021
  • August 30, 2021: [Presentence Investigation Report -Draft]
July, 2021
  • July 12, 2021: [Forfeiture of Property ]
  • July 12, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
June, 2021
  • June 29, 2021: [Plea Agreement ]
  • June 29, 2021: [Arraignment ]
  • June 29, 2021: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • June 08, 2021: [Notice of Hearing ]
  • June 07, 2021: [Notice of Substitution of Counsel- Defendant]
April, 2021
  • April 27, 2021: [Scheduling Order ]
  • April 21, 2021: [Unredacted Document]
  • April 21, 2021: [Penalty Sheet]
  • April 21, 2021: [Indictment ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.