U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:21-cr-00181-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Zavaleta-Castro
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
September, 2022
  • September 09, 2022: [Notice-other]
  • September 09, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
December, 2021
  • December 09, 2021: [Judgment ]
  • December 09, 2021: [Document]
  • December 08, 2021: [Sentencing ]
  • December 08, 2021: [Notice-other]
November, 2021
  • November 22, 2021: [Presentence Investigation Report - Final]
  • November 08, 2021: [Objection to PSI]
  • November 05, 2021: [Objection to PSI]
October, 2021
  • October 25, 2021: [Presentence Investigation Report -Draft]
August, 2021
  • August 25, 2021: [Document]
  • August 25, 2021: [Plea Agreement ]
  • August 25, 2021: [Arraignment ]
  • August 25, 2021: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • August 23, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • August 16, 2021: [Notice-other]
  • August 16, 2021: [Proposed Order]
July, 2021
  • July 26, 2021: [Notice of Hearing ]
May, 2021
  • May 26, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • May 26, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • May 25, 2021: [Extension of Time]
  • May 25, 2021: [Continue ]
  • May 07, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • May 06, 2021: [Motion Submitted]
  • May 06, 2021: [Extension of Time]
April, 2021
  • April 26, 2021: [Scheduling Order ]
  • April 21, 2021: [Penalty Sheet]
  • April 21, 2021: [Indictment ]
  • April 21, 2021: [Unredacted Document]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.