U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:21-cr-00179-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Curtis
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 03, 2023: [Document]
December, 2022
  • December 29, 2022: [Letter]
November, 2022
  • November 01, 2022: [Notice-other]
  • November 01, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
May, 2022
  • May 24, 2022: [Judgment ]
  • May 18, 2022: [Sentencing ]
  • May 11, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report - Final]
April, 2022
  • April 27, 2022: [Objection to PSI]
  • April 22, 2022: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property ]
  • April 21, 2022: [Forfeiture of Property ]
  • April 21, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • April 12, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report -Draft]
February, 2022
  • February 16, 2022: [Plea Agreement ]
  • February 16, 2022: [Arraignment ]
  • February 16, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • February 16, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
January, 2022
  • January 31, 2022: [Docket Call]
  • January 31, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
December, 2021
  • December 01, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • December 01, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
November, 2021
  • November 30, 2021: [Motion Submitted]
  • November 30, 2021: [Continue ]
  • November 30, 2021: [Extension of Time]
October, 2021
  • October 26, 2021: [Continue ]
  • October 26, 2021: [Extension of Time]
September, 2021
  • September 15, 2021: [Continue ]
  • September 15, 2021: [Extension of Time]
  • September 14, 2021: [Notice of Deficiency]
  • September 14, 2021: [Continue ]
  • September 14, 2021: [Extension of Time]
  • September 14, 2021: [Notice of Substitution of Counsel - USA]
June, 2021
  • June 29, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • June 29, 2021: [Continue ]
  • June 29, 2021: [Extension of Time]
  • June 14, 2021: [Notice of Hearing ]
  • June 03, 2021: [Order - Written Order Following Oral Order on Motion]
  • June 02, 2021: [Exhibit List ]
  • June 02, 2021: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • June 02, 2021: [Detention Hearing ]
May, 2021
  • May 26, 2021: [Continue ]
  • May 20, 2021: [Docket Call]
  • May 20, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • May 13, 2021: [Docket Call]
  • May 13, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • May 13, 2021: [Continue ]
  • May 10, 2021: [Continue ]
  • May 04, 2021: [Pretrial Services Report]
  • May 04, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • May 04, 2021: [Motion Referred]
  • May 04, 2021: [Continue ]
  • May 03, 2021: [Scheduling Order ]
April, 2021
  • April 30, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • April 30, 2021: [Order of Detention - Temporary]
  • April 30, 2021: [Initial Appearance ]
  • April 30, 2021: [Detention]
  • April 30, 2021: [Text Order]
  • April 30, 2021: [Order]
  • April 30, 2021: [Arrest ]
  • April 27, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • April 26, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 21, 2021: [Warrant Issued ]
  • April 21, 2021: [Penalty Sheet]
  • April 21, 2021: [Indictment ]
  • April 21, 2021: [Unredacted Document]
  • April 21, 2021: [Warrant Requested]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.