U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:21-cr-00178-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Heard
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 08, 2025: [USCA Order]
March, 2025
  • March 19, 2025: [USCA Order]
January, 2023
  • January 19, 2023: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • January 18, 2023: [Continue ]
December, 2022
  • December 01, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
November, 2022
  • November 30, 2022: [Continue ]
September, 2022
  • September 29, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • September 29, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • September 28, 2022: [Continue ]
  • September 28, 2022: [Extension of Time]
August, 2022
  • August 16, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • August 16, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • August 15, 2022: [Continue ]
  • August 15, 2022: [Extension of Time]
July, 2022
  • July 19, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • July 19, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • July 18, 2022: [Continue ]
  • July 18, 2022: [Extension of Time]
June, 2022
  • June 07, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • June 07, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • June 06, 2022: [Continue ]
  • June 06, 2022: [Extension of Time]
May, 2022
  • May 17, 2022: [Extension of Time]
April, 2022
  • April 13, 2022: [Continue ]
  • April 13, 2022: [Extension of Time]
March, 2022
  • March 29, 2022: [Notice of Substitution of Counsel - USA]
  • March 01, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • March 01, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
February, 2022
  • February 28, 2022: [Continue ]
  • February 28, 2022: [Extension of Time]
December, 2021
  • December 13, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • December 13, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • December 08, 2021: [Extension of Time]
  • December 08, 2021: [Continue ]
  • December 08, 2021: [Notice of Hearing ]
  • December 03, 2021: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney ]
  • December 01, 2021: [Withdraw as Attorney ]
November, 2021
  • November 30, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • November 10, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • November 08, 2021: [Continue ]
October, 2021
  • October 08, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Sentencing]
  • October 08, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • October 07, 2021: [Continue Sentencing]
  • October 07, 2021: [Extension of Time]
September, 2021
  • September 14, 2021: [Notice of Substitution of Counsel - USA]
  • September 07, 2021: [Continue ]
  • September 07, 2021: [Extension of Time]
August, 2021
  • August 04, 2021: [Continue ]
  • August 04, 2021: [Extension of Time]
June, 2021
  • June 04, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • June 04, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • June 04, 2021: [Continue ]
  • June 04, 2021: [Extension of Time]
May, 2021
  • May 17, 2021: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney ]
  • May 14, 2021: [Motion Submitted]
  • May 14, 2021: [Withdraw as Attorney ]
  • May 14, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • May 05, 2021: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • May 05, 2021: [Waiver of Detention Hearing]
  • May 05, 2021: [Detention Hearing ]
  • May 05, 2021: [Pretrial Services Report]
  • May 04, 2021: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued ]
  • May 04, 2021: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • May 04, 2021: [Scheduling Order ]
  • May 03, 2021: [Request for Discovery]
  • May 03, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
April, 2021
  • April 30, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • April 30, 2021: [Order of Detention - Temporary]
  • April 30, 2021: [Initial Appearance ]
  • April 30, 2021: [Text Order]
  • April 30, 2021: [Order]
  • April 30, 2021: [Detention]
  • April 30, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • April 30, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • April 30, 2021: [Arrest ]
  • April 28, 2021: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued ]
  • April 28, 2021: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • April 26, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 21, 2021: [Penalty Sheet]
  • April 21, 2021: [Warrant Requested]
  • April 21, 2021: [Warrant Issued ]
  • April 21, 2021: [Indictment ]
  • April 21, 2021: [Unredacted Document]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.