U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:21-cr-00177-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Hedgepeth
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
September, 2022
  • September 12, 2022: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
June, 2022
  • June 09, 2022: [Notice of Filing of Official Transcript]
  • June 09, 2022: [Transcript]
May, 2022
  • May 11, 2022: [Judgment ]
  • May 10, 2022: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • May 10, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • May 10, 2022: [Sentencing ]
  • May 04, 2022: [Order on Motion to Seal ]
  • May 04, 2022: [Seal ]
  • May 04, 2022: [PROPOSED SEALED Document]
  • May 03, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • May 03, 2022: [Notice-other]
April, 2022
  • April 27, 2022: [Letter]
  • April 21, 2022: [Amended Presentence Investigation Report]
  • April 19, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum (NOT SEALED)]
  • April 19, 2022: [Objection to PSI]
March, 2022
  • March 29, 2022: [SEALED Document]
January, 2022
  • January 12, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report - Final]
October, 2021
  • October 20, 2021: [Objection to PSI]
  • October 05, 2021: [Presentence Investigation Report -Draft]
July, 2021
  • July 27, 2021: [Order Setting/Resetting Hearings]
  • July 27, 2021: [Consent to Magistrate Arraignment]
  • July 27, 2021: [Arraignment ]
  • July 27, 2021: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • July 26, 2021: [Amended Penalty Sheet]
June, 2021
  • June 15, 2021: [Case Unsealed]
May, 2021
  • May 28, 2021: [SEALED Document]
  • May 28, 2021: [Order - Written Order Following Oral Order on Motion]
  • May 26, 2021: [Notice of Hearing on Motion ]
  • May 25, 2021: [Motion Submitted]
  • May 25, 2021: [Seal ]
  • May 25, 2021: [PROPOSED SEALED Motion]
  • May 21, 2021: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • May 21, 2021: [Detention Hearing ]
  • May 11, 2021: [Pretrial Services Report]
  • May 11, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • May 11, 2021: [Continue ]
  • May 10, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • May 10, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • May 10, 2021: [Request for Discovery]
  • May 07, 2021: [Scheduling Order ]
  • May 07, 2021: [Text Order]
  • May 07, 2021: [Order of Detention - Temporary]
  • May 07, 2021: [Initial Appearance ]
  • May 07, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • May 07, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • May 07, 2021: [Detention]
  • May 07, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • May 07, 2021: [Arrest ]
  • May 06, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
April, 2021
  • April 21, 2021: [Warrant Issued ]
  • April 21, 2021: [Penalty Sheet]
  • April 21, 2021: [Indictment ]
  • April 21, 2021: [Unredacted Document]
  • April 21, 2021: [Warrant Requested]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.