U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:21-cr-00176-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Wilson
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 22, 2025: [Judgment on 2255]
  • April 22, 2025: [Judgment on Motion to Vacate (2255) ]
  • April 22, 2025: [Order on Motion to Dismiss ]
January, 2023
  • January 25, 2023: [Order on Motion to Seal ]
  • January 24, 2023: [Seal ]
  • January 24, 2023: [PROPOSED SEALED Motion]
October, 2022
  • October 17, 2022: [Continue Sentencing]
August, 2022
  • August 22, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Sentencing]
  • August 19, 2022: [Continue Sentencing]
July, 2022
  • July 22, 2022: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property ]
  • July 22, 2022: [Notice of Deficiency - Failure to File Proposed Order]
  • July 21, 2022: [Forfeiture of Property ]
  • July 21, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • July 01, 2022: [Continue Sentencing]
June, 2022
  • June 13, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report - Final]
  • June 03, 2022: [Objection to PSI]
  • June 01, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
May, 2022
  • May 31, 2022: [Extension of Time]
  • May 03, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • May 03, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Sentencing]
April, 2022
  • April 28, 2022: [Extension of Time]
  • April 28, 2022: [Continue Sentencing]
March, 2022
  • March 21, 2022: [PETITION and ORDER for Action on Pretrial Release]
February, 2022
  • February 28, 2022: [Extension of Time]
  • February 28, 2022: [Continue Sentencing]
  • February 14, 2022: [Extension of Time]
  • February 14, 2022: [Continue Sentencing]
January, 2022
  • January 13, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Sentencing]
  • January 13, 2022: [Extension of Time]
  • January 13, 2022: [Continue Sentencing]
  • January 13, 2022: [Objection to PSI]
December, 2021
  • December 28, 2021: [Presentence Investigation Report -Draft]
November, 2021
  • November 22, 2021: [Order]
  • November 16, 2021: [Arraignment ]
  • November 16, 2021: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • November 16, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • November 03, 2021: [Release Status Report]
October, 2021
  • October 14, 2021: [Release Status Report]
  • October 04, 2021: [Notice of Hearing ]
August, 2021
  • August 31, 2021: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • August 31, 2021: [Motion Submitted]
  • August 31, 2021: [Modify Conditions of Release]
July, 2021
  • July 27, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • July 27, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • July 27, 2021: [Extension of Time]
  • July 27, 2021: [Continue ]
  • July 02, 2021: [Detention Hearing ]
  • July 02, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release ]
June, 2021
  • June 28, 2021: [Detention Hearing ]
  • June 28, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • June 28, 2021: [Text Order]
  • June 28, 2021: [Pretrial Services Report]
  • June 25, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • June 25, 2021: [Request for Discovery]
  • June 24, 2021: [Scheduling Order ]
  • June 23, 2021: [Order of Detention - Temporary]
  • June 23, 2021: [Initial Appearance ]
  • June 23, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • June 23, 2021: [Order]
  • June 23, 2021: [Oral Order]
  • June 23, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • June 23, 2021: [Detention]
  • June 23, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • June 23, 2021: [Arrest ]
  • June 23, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • June 22, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
April, 2021
  • April 21, 2021: [Warrant Issued ]
  • April 21, 2021: [Penalty Sheet]
  • April 21, 2021: [Unredacted Document]
  • April 21, 2021: [Warrant Requested]
  • April 21, 2021: [Indictment ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.