U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:17-cr-00368-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Aldana
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
August, 2022
  • August 10, 2022: [Transcript]
September, 2021
  • September 03, 2021: [Transcript]
August, 2021
  • August 12, 2021: [Judgment - Revocation Proceedings]
  • August 02, 2021: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
May, 2021
  • May 24, 2021: [Notice of Cancellation of Hearing]
April, 2021
  • April 29, 2021: [Order of Detention]
  • April 28, 2021: [Preliminary Revocation Hearing]
  • April 28, 2021: [Detention Hearing]
  • April 23, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Other]
  • April 23, 2021: [Continue Other]
  • April 22, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
  • April 22, 2021: [Addendum To Violation Report (PostTrial)]
  • April 21, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • April 21, 2021: [Case Unsealed]
  • April 21, 2021: [CJA 20 - Appointment]
  • April 21, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • April 21, 2021: [Oral Order Appointing Counsel]
  • April 21, 2021: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.