U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:21-cr-00113-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Royster
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
March, 2022
  • March 15, 2022: [Judgment - Statement of Reasons]
  • March 15, 2022: [Judgment]
  • March 11, 2022: [Sentencing]
  • March 07, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum or Response]
February, 2022
  • February 24, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
September, 2021
  • September 16, 2021: [Presentence Investigation Report]
August, 2021
  • August 30, 2021: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • August 30, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
  • August 16, 2021: [Service by Publication]
July, 2021
  • July 19, 2021: [USDOJ Return of Service]
  • July 15, 2021: [Judgment of Forfeiture]
  • July 15, 2021: [Acceptance of Guilty Plea]
  • July 15, 2021: [Notice of PSI Interview Preference]
  • July 15, 2021: [Plea Hearing]
  • July 13, 2021: [Factual Basis]
  • July 13, 2021: [Plea Agreement]
  • July 13, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
May, 2021
  • May 24, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • May 24, 2021: [Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • May 24, 2021: [Status Conference]
  • May 18, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • May 17, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • May 07, 2021: [Order of Detention]
  • May 07, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
  • May 07, 2021: [Standard Discovery Order]
  • May 07, 2021: [Arraignment]
  • May 07, 2021: [Detention Hearing]
  • May 06, 2021: [Pretrial Report]
  • May 05, 2021: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • May 05, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
  • May 05, 2021: [Oral Order Appointing Counsel]
  • May 05, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • May 05, 2021: [Initial Appearance]
  • May 05, 2021: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • May 05, 2021: [Arrest]
April, 2021
  • April 22, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • April 22, 2021: [Warrant Issued]
  • April 22, 2021: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.