U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:21-cr-00107-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Willis
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
August, 2021
  • August 11, 2021: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • August 02, 2021: [Dismiss]
May, 2021
  • May 28, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • May 26, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • May 26, 2021: [Pretrial Report]
  • May 24, 2021: [Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • May 24, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • May 24, 2021: [Standard Discovery Order]
  • May 24, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
  • May 24, 2021: [Order of Detention]
  • May 24, 2021: [Oral Order Appointing Counsel]
  • May 24, 2021: [Initial Appearance and Arraignment]
  • May 24, 2021: [Arrest]
  • May 07, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
  • May 07, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • May 03, 2021: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued]
  • May 03, 2021: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
April, 2021
  • April 23, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • April 22, 2021: [Warrant Issued]
  • April 22, 2021: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.