U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:21-cr-00028-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Driggers
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
June, 2022
  • June 30, 2022: [Transcript]
December, 2021
  • December 10, 2021: [Judgment - Statement of Reasons]
  • December 10, 2021: [Judgment]
  • December 09, 2021: [Sentencing]
  • December 08, 2021: [Letters of Recommendation/Support regarding Sentencing]
  • December 07, 2021: [Sentencing Memorandum or Response]
  • December 06, 2021: [Presentence Investigation Report]
October, 2021
  • October 28, 2021: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • October 07, 2021: [Oral or Text-Only Order]
  • October 07, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • October 07, 2021: [Sealed Motion]
September, 2021
  • September 23, 2021: [Presentence Investigation Report]
July, 2021
  • July 20, 2021: [Judgment of Forfeiture]
  • July 20, 2021: [Notice of PSI Interview Preference]
  • July 20, 2021: [Acceptance of Guilty Plea]
  • July 20, 2021: [Plea Hearing]
  • July 09, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
  • July 06, 2021: [Plea Agreement]
  • July 06, 2021: [Factual Basis]
June, 2021
  • June 21, 2021: [Pretrial Report]
  • June 18, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • June 15, 2021: [Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • June 11, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
  • June 11, 2021: [Standard Discovery Order]
  • June 08, 2021: [CJA 20 - Appointment]
  • June 08, 2021: [Order of Detention]
  • June 08, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • June 08, 2021: [Oral Order Appointing Counsel]
  • June 08, 2021: [Initial Appearance]
  • June 08, 2021: [Arraignment]
  • June 08, 2021: [Arrest]
  • June 08, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed]
April, 2021
  • April 27, 2021: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued]
  • April 26, 2021: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • April 26, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • April 22, 2021: [Warrant Issued]
  • April 22, 2021: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.