U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:21-cr-00115-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Frank
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 13, 2022: [Letter]
May, 2022
  • May 31, 2022: [Exhibit]
  • May 31, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • May 20, 2022: [Objection to Presentence Investigation Report]
April, 2022
  • April 25, 2022: [Status Report]
  • April 07, 2022: [Order on Motion for Psychiatric Exam]
  • April 05, 2022: [Order on Motion to Seal]
  • April 04, 2022: [Seal]
March, 2022
  • March 23, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Objections to PSR]
  • March 21, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Objections to PSR]
  • March 11, 2022: [Service by Publication]
February, 2022
  • February 17, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Objections to PSR]
  • February 17, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Objections to PSR]
  • February 03, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
January, 2022
  • January 18, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
December, 2021
  • December 07, 2021: [Judgment of Forfeiture]
  • December 07, 2021: [Notice of PSI Interview Preference]
  • December 07, 2021: [Acceptance of Guilty Plea]
  • December 07, 2021: [Plea Hearing]
  • December 07, 2021: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • December 01, 2021: [Plea Agreement]
  • December 01, 2021: [Factual Basis]
October, 2021
  • October 22, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • October 18, 2021: [Continue Docket Call/Trial]
August, 2021
  • August 23, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • August 11, 2021: [Continue Docket Call/Trial]
June, 2021
  • June 17, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • June 16, 2021: [Continue Docket Call/Trial]
May, 2021
  • May 24, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • May 17, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • May 12, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
  • May 12, 2021: [Standard Discovery Order]
  • May 12, 2021: [Order of Detention]
  • May 12, 2021: [Detention Hearing]
  • May 12, 2021: [Arraignment]
  • May 10, 2021: [Pretrial Report]
  • May 07, 2021: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • May 07, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
  • May 07, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • May 07, 2021: [Oral Order Appointing Counsel]
  • May 07, 2021: [Initial Appearance]
  • May 07, 2021: [Arrest]
April, 2021
  • April 23, 2021: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued]
  • April 23, 2021: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • April 22, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • April 22, 2021: [Warrant Issued]
  • April 22, 2021: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.