U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:21-cr-00119-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Hilburn
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
July, 2022
  • July 01, 2022: [Judgment - Statement of Reasons]
  • July 01, 2022: [Judgment]
June, 2022
  • June 30, 2022: [Sentencing]
  • June 27, 2022: [Letters of Recommendation/Support regarding Sentencing]
April, 2022
  • April 11, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
January, 2022
  • January 07, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
December, 2021
  • December 06, 2021: [Service by Publication]
November, 2021
  • November 09, 2021: [USDOJ Return of Service]
  • November 05, 2021: [Judgment of Forfeiture]
  • November 05, 2021: [Notice of PSI Interview Preference]
  • November 05, 2021: [Plea Hearing]
  • November 05, 2021: [Acceptance of Guilty Plea]
October, 2021
  • October 26, 2021: [Factual Basis]
  • October 26, 2021: [Plea Agreement]
  • October 12, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • October 07, 2021: [Continue Docket Call/Trial]
August, 2021
  • August 25, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • August 25, 2021: [Continue Docket Call/Trial]
June, 2021
  • June 08, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • June 07, 2021: [Continue Docket Call/Trial]
April, 2021
  • April 29, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • April 29, 2021: [Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • April 28, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
  • April 28, 2021: [Standard Discovery Order]
  • April 28, 2021: [Arraignment]
  • April 23, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • April 22, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
  • April 22, 2021: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.