U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:21-cr-00026-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Lopez
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
November, 2021
  • November 02, 2021: [Judgment Returned Executed]
October, 2021
  • October 26, 2021: [Judgment - Statement of Reasons]
  • October 26, 2021: [Judgment]
  • October 26, 2021: [Sentencing]
  • October 04, 2021: [Presentence Investigation Report]
September, 2021
  • September 22, 2021: [Objection to Presentence Investigation Report]
  • September 14, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Objections to PSR]
  • September 14, 2021: [Extension of Time to File Objections to PSR]
August, 2021
  • August 31, 2021: [Presentence Investigation Report]
July, 2021
  • July 08, 2021: [Notice of PSI Interview Preference]
  • July 08, 2021: [Acceptance of Guilty Plea]
  • July 08, 2021: [Plea Hearing - Straight Up]
  • July 02, 2021: [Factual Basis]
May, 2021
  • May 24, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • May 24, 2021: [Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • May 24, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • May 21, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
  • May 21, 2021: [Standard Discovery Order]
  • May 21, 2021: [Order of Detention]
  • May 21, 2021: [Arraignment]
  • May 21, 2021: [Detention Hearing]
  • May 19, 2021: [Pretrial Report]
  • May 19, 2021: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • May 18, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
  • May 18, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • May 18, 2021: [Oral Order Appointing Counsel]
  • May 18, 2021: [Initial Appearance]
  • May 18, 2021: [Arrest]
  • May 18, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
April, 2021
  • April 22, 2021: [Warrant Issued]
  • April 22, 2021: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.