U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:21-cr-00120-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Rosario Loaeza
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2021
  • October 26, 2021: [Judgment - Statement of Reasons]
  • October 26, 2021: [Judgment]
  • October 22, 2021: [Sentencing]
August, 2021
  • August 10, 2021: [Presentence Investigation Report]
July, 2021
  • July 21, 2021: [Presentence Investigation Report]
June, 2021
  • June 10, 2021: [Notice of PSI Interview Preference]
  • June 10, 2021: [Acceptance of Guilty Plea]
  • June 10, 2021: [Plea Hearing - Straight Up]
  • June 08, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
  • June 08, 2021: [Factual Basis]
May, 2021
  • May 21, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • May 19, 2021: [Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • May 06, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed]
April, 2021
  • April 28, 2021: [Pretrial Report]
  • April 26, 2021: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • April 23, 2021: [Standard Discovery Order]
  • April 23, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
  • April 23, 2021: [Order of Detention]
  • April 23, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • April 23, 2021: [Oral Order Appointing Counsel]
  • April 23, 2021: [Initial Appearance]
  • April 23, 2021: [Arraignment]
  • April 23, 2021: [Arrest]
  • April 22, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 22, 2021: [Warrant Issued]
  • April 22, 2021: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.