U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:21-cr-00030-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Daye
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Mandate - USCA]
August, 2022
  • August 29, 2022: [Transcript - Appeal]
  • August 10, 2022: [Transcript Order Acknowledgment - Appeal]
July, 2022
  • July 22, 2022: [Order - Other - USCA]
  • July 22, 2022: [Case Number - USCA]
  • July 22, 2022: [Transmission of Notice of Appeal to USCA]
  • July 22, 2022: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment - USCA]
  • July 21, 2022: [Judgment - Statement of Reasons]
  • July 21, 2022: [Judgment]
  • July 21, 2022: [Sentencing]
  • July 18, 2022: [Letters of Recommendation/Support regarding Sentencing]
  • July 18, 2022: [Seal Document]
  • July 18, 2022: [Sealed Document]
  • July 13, 2022: [Seal Document]
  • July 13, 2022: [Sealed Sentencing Memorandum or Response]
  • July 10, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
June, 2022
  • June 03, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
May, 2022
  • May 20, 2022: [Response to Objection to Presentence Investigation Report]
  • May 13, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • May 12, 2022: [Response - other]
March, 2022
  • March 31, 2022: [Objection to Presentence Investigation Report]
  • March 07, 2022: [Withdraw Document]
  • March 04, 2022: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • March 04, 2022: [Seal Document]
February, 2022
  • February 10, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Objections to PSR]
  • February 09, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Objections to PSR]
January, 2022
  • January 27, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
November, 2021
  • November 19, 2021: [Notice of PSI Interview Preference]
  • November 19, 2021: [Acceptance of Guilty Plea]
  • November 19, 2021: [Plea Hearing - Straight Up]
  • November 19, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
  • November 10, 2021: [Factual Basis]
October, 2021
  • October 05, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • October 04, 2021: [Continue Docket Call/Trial]
August, 2021
  • August 03, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • August 02, 2021: [Continue Docket Call/Trial]
June, 2021
  • June 08, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • June 07, 2021: [Continue Docket Call/Trial]
April, 2021
  • April 28, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
  • April 28, 2021: [Standard Discovery Order]
  • April 27, 2021: [Order of Detention]
  • April 27, 2021: [Arraignment and Detention]
  • April 26, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • April 22, 2021: [Pretrial Report]
  • April 22, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
  • April 22, 2021: [Indictment]
  • April 21, 2021: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.