U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:21-cr-00029-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Dalton
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
July, 2022
  • July 21, 2022: [Judgment - Statement of Reasons]
  • July 21, 2022: [Judgment]
  • July 20, 2022: [Sentencing]
  • July 19, 2022: [Letters of Recommendation/Support regarding Sentencing]
  • July 07, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
February, 2022
  • February 14, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
January, 2022
  • January 10, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Objections to PSR]
December, 2021
  • December 20, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Objections to PSR]
  • December 20, 2021: [Extension of Time to File Objections to PSR]
  • December 06, 2021: [Presentence Investigation Report]
October, 2021
  • October 07, 2021: [Notice of PSI Interview Preference]
  • October 07, 2021: [Acceptance of Guilty Plea]
  • October 07, 2021: [Plea Hearing]
  • October 06, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
  • October 01, 2021: [Plea Agreement]
  • October 01, 2021: [Factual Basis]
July, 2021
  • July 19, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • July 19, 2021: [Continue Docket Call/Trial]
June, 2021
  • June 02, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • June 02, 2021: [Continue Docket Call/Trial]
May, 2021
  • May 05, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed]
April, 2021
  • April 28, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
  • April 28, 2021: [Standard Discovery Order]
  • April 26, 2021: [Order of Detention]
  • April 26, 2021: [Arraignment and Detention]
  • April 26, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • April 25, 2021: [Pretrial Report]
  • April 22, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
  • April 22, 2021: [Indictment]
  • April 22, 2021: [CJA 20 - Appointment]
  • April 21, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • April 21, 2021: [Oral Order Appointing Counsel]
  • April 21, 2021: [Initial Appearance]
  • April 21, 2021: [Arrest]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.