U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:21-cr-00114-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Kamgaing
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 12, 2023: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • January 11, 2023: [Miscellaneous Relief]
April, 2022
  • April 07, 2022: [USMS Return of Service]
  • April 05, 2022: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property]
March, 2022
  • March 25, 2022: [Forfeiture of Property]
January, 2022
  • January 06, 2022: [Judgment - Statement of Reasons]
  • January 06, 2022: [Judgment]
  • January 06, 2022: [Judgment of Forfeiture]
  • January 06, 2022: [Sentencing]
December, 2021
  • December 30, 2021: [Sentencing Memorandum or Response]
  • December 29, 2021: [Sentencing Memorandum or Response]
November, 2021
  • November 16, 2021: [Presentence Investigation Report]
October, 2021
  • October 26, 2021: [Presentence Investigation Report]
August, 2021
  • August 25, 2021: [Notice of PSI Interview Preference]
  • August 25, 2021: [Acceptance of Guilty Plea]
  • August 25, 2021: [Plea Hearing]
  • August 17, 2021: [Factual Basis]
  • August 17, 2021: [Plea Agreement]
July, 2021
  • July 08, 2021: [Summons Returned Executed]
June, 2021
  • June 22, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • June 22, 2021: [Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • June 18, 2021: [Continue Docket Call/Trial]
May, 2021
  • May 06, 2021: [Warrant Returned Unexecuted]
April, 2021
  • April 29, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • April 28, 2021: [Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • April 28, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
  • April 28, 2021: [Standard Discovery Order]
  • April 27, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • April 27, 2021: [Bond]
  • April 27, 2021: [Pretrial Report]
  • April 27, 2021: [Initial Appearance and Arraignment]
  • April 23, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
  • April 23, 2021: [Summons Issued]
  • April 23, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • April 23, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • April 22, 2021: [Warrant Issued]
  • April 22, 2021: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.