U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:21-cr-00109-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Ferretiz Torres
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
August, 2022
  • August 31, 2022: [Judgment - Statement of Reasons]
  • August 31, 2022: [Judgment]
  • August 25, 2022: [Sentencing]
July, 2022
  • July 18, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
June, 2022
  • June 14, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
April, 2022
  • April 28, 2022: [Notice of PSI Interview Preference]
  • April 28, 2022: [Plea Hearing - Straight Up]
  • April 28, 2022: [Acceptance of Guilty Plea]
  • April 28, 2022: [Factual Basis]
  • April 25, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
February, 2022
  • February 22, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • February 22, 2022: [Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • February 22, 2022: [Status Conference]
January, 2022
  • January 19, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
December, 2021
  • December 17, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • December 15, 2021: [Continue Docket Call/Trial]
November, 2021
  • November 15, 2021: [Pretrial Report]
  • November 10, 2021: [Order of Detention]
  • November 10, 2021: [Order Due Process Protection Act]
  • November 10, 2021: [Standard Discovery Order]
  • November 10, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
  • November 10, 2021: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • November 09, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • November 09, 2021: [Oral Order Appointing Counsel]
  • November 09, 2021: [Initial Appearance and Arraignment]
  • November 09, 2021: [Arrest]
  • November 09, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • November 08, 2021: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
April, 2021
  • April 22, 2021: [Warrant Issued]
  • April 22, 2021: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.