U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:21-cr-00118-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Sturdivant
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
September, 2022
  • September 30, 2022: [Judgment - Statement of Reasons]
  • September 30, 2022: [Judgment]
  • September 29, 2022: [Sentencing]
  • September 26, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum or Response]
  • September 22, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum or Response]
December, 2021
  • December 10, 2021: [Letters of Recommendation/Support regarding Sentencing]
September, 2021
  • September 20, 2021: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • September 16, 2021: [Objection to Presentence Investigation Report]
  • September 03, 2021: [Presentence Investigation Report]
August, 2021
  • August 19, 2021: [Notice of PSI Interview Preference]
  • August 19, 2021: [Acceptance of Guilty Plea]
  • August 19, 2021: [Plea Hearing]
  • August 16, 2021: [Factual Basis]
  • August 16, 2021: [Plea Agreement]
June, 2021
  • June 16, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • June 04, 2021: [Continue Docket Call/Trial]
May, 2021
  • May 24, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • May 06, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • May 04, 2021: [Exhibit]
  • May 04, 2021: [Order of Detention]
  • May 04, 2021: [Standard Discovery Order]
  • May 04, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
  • May 04, 2021: [Arraignment]
  • May 04, 2021: [Detention Hearing]
  • May 03, 2021: [Pretrial Report]
April, 2021
  • April 29, 2021: [Warrant Returned Unexecuted]
  • April 29, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
  • April 29, 2021: [Order Appointing Community Defender]
  • April 29, 2021: [Initial Appearance]
  • April 29, 2021: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • April 29, 2021: [Arrest]
  • April 22, 2021: [Warrant Issued]
  • April 22, 2021: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.